This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 07/04/2017 at 15:28:59 (UTC).

EQUITY RESIDENTIAL MANAGEMENT VS DEJESUS, BENZ

Case Summary

On 08/16/2012 EQUITY RESIDENTIAL MANAGEMENT filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DEJESUS, BENZ. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Concord Superior Court located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0619

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Concord Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EQUITY RESIDENTIALMANAGEMENT,LLC.

Defendants

ALBA DEJESUS

JASON BENZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HARRIS, KEVIN A

351 St. Mary Street

Pleasanton, CA 94566

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2013
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA RETURNED UN-SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2012
  • REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO THE ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2012
  • CIVIL SAD BEFORE TRIAL - REQ. DISM. - NO ADR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2012
  • ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2012
  • DEFAULT SET ASIDE ON ALBA DEJESUS, JASON BENZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2012
  • ORDER TO/FOR SETTING ASIDE DEFAULT & JUDGMENT & DISMISSING CASE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2012
  • (PROPOSED) ORDER TO VACATE DEFAULT & JUDGMENT SUBMITTED TO COMMISSIONER CREIGHTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2012
  • FEE RECEIVED FOR ORDER ON APPLICATION TO VACATE DEFAULT & JUDGMENT FROM EQUITY RESIDENTIALMANAGEMENT,LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2012
  • APPLICATION TO VACATE DEFAULT & DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND DISMISS CASE FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2012
  • CLERK`S CALENDAR - FAILURE TO DISPOSITION UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/28/2012
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ON 08/28/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2012
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 08/16/2012 OF EQUITY RESIDENTIALMANAGEMENT,LLC. FILED AS TO DEFENDANT ALBA DEJESUS, JASON BENZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2012
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON THE UD COMPLAINT FILED 08/16/2012 OF EQUITY RESIDENTIALMANAGEMENT,LLC. AGAINST DEFENDANT ALBA DEJESUS, JASON BENZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 08/16/2012 OF EQUITY RESIDENTIALMANAGEMENT,LLC. AS TO DEF ENDANT ALBA DEJESUS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/19/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 08/16/2012 OF EQUITY RESIDENTIALMANAGEMENT,LLC. AS TO DEF ENDANT JASON BENZ WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/19/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2012
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED (UNDER $10,000). SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2012
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2012
  • HEARING ON FAILURE TO DISPOSITION UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT WAS SET FOR 10/03/12 AT 17:00 IN DEPT. 3CLK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2012
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 08/16/2012 OF EQUITY RESIDENTIALMANAGEMENT,LLC. FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS BLUE

    Read MoreRead Less