This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 08/31/2016 at 15:02:58 (UTC).

ENGELSTAD ET AL V. WASHINGTON MUTUAL BANK ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/13/2009 ENGELSTAD filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against WASHINGTON MUTUAL BANK. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0369

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WAYNE ENGELSTAD

ELIA ENGELSTAD

Cross Defendants and Defendants

JP MORGAN CHASE BANK N.A

KB HOME MORTGAGE COMPANY

WASHINGTON MUTUAL BANK, FA

CALIFORNIA RECONVEYANCE COMPANY

FIRST AMERICAN TITLE

KB HOME MORTGAGE

QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORPORATION

WASHINGTON MUTUAL BANK, A CALIFORNIA CORP-

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

KB HOME MORTGAGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GAVIN, SEAN

3841 North Freeway Blvd, #185

Sacramento, CA 95834

Cross Defendant and Defendant Attorneys

BRENNAN, VALERIE K

1 Macarthur Place Suite 200

Santa Ana, CA 92707

FUJI, IRENE Y

150 Post Street Ste 700

San Franicsco, CA 94108

LOWENTHAL, JEFFREY H

One California Street Third Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

PODMENIK, MATTHEW

1770 Fourth Ave

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

FUJI, IRENE Y

150 Post Street Ste 700

San Franicsco, CA 94108

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2010
  • CHECK FOR DISMISSAL; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2010
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2010
  • HEARING ON DEMURRER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 10/02/2009 OF KB HOME MORTGAGE FILED BY JP MORGAN CHASE BANK N.A; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2010
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2009
  • DISMISSAL FILED/ENTERED ON THE CROSS-COMPLAINT OF KB HOME MORTGAGE CO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2009
  • CLERK`S TICKLER WAS SET FOR 2/09/10 AT 7:00 IN DEPT 16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2009
  • NOTICE OF/TO SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED ON BEHALF OF KB HOME MORTGAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2009
  • CASE REMOVED FROM COURT`S CONTROL DUE TO NOTICE OF UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT HAVING BEEN FILED/ENTERED INTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2009
  • CHECK FOR PAYMENT OF $500 FROM PLAINITFF; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED RE: CHECK $210 FOR ENGELSTAD V. WASHINGTON MUTUAL BANK SANCTIONS FOR $500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
94 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2009
  • DECLARATION OF QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORPORATION FILED RE: NONMONETARY STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2009
  • DEFENDANT QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORPORATION ADDS ATTORNEY MATTHEW PODMENIK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2009
  • WE CANNOT FILE/ISSUE YOUR NONMONETARY STATUS, DECLARATION AND PROOF OF SVC FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2009
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2009
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 02/13/2009 OF WAYNE ENGELSTAD FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2009
  • COLOR OF FILE IS BLUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2009
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 4/20/09 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2009
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 7/02/09 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2009
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS NOT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2009
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 16

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KB HOME MORTGAGE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where FIRST AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY, A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Washington Mutual Bank is a litigant

Latest cases where California Reconveyance Company Trustee is a litigant