This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 09/23/2021 at 19:01:48 (UTC).

ELLIS VS ARB, INC.

Case Summary

On 10/26/2020 ELLIS filed an Other lawsuit against ARB, INC. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2183

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GARY ELLIS

Defendant

ARB, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SPENCER, ROBERT W

1965 Market Street

San Francisco, CA 94103

Defendant Attorney

CARTER, JAMES P

200 Spectrum Center Dr Ste 500

Irvine, CA 92618

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2021
  • HearingDept: 39; Action text: FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketFURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketELECTRONIC FILING TRANSACTION FEE COLLECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF STANDING ORDER AND MANDATING ELECTRONIC FILING FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketCHECK FOR REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketORDER MANDATING ELECTRONIC FILING & SERVICE/ORDER TO SHO W CAUSE RE: EXEMPTIONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketORDER RE ELECTRONIC CASE FILING - STANDING ORDER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketUPDATE TRACK ASSIGNMENT TO ELECRONIC FAST TRACK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketADVANCED NON-REFUNDABLE JURY FEE PAID BY: INFOTRACK US, INC, ON BEHALF OF PARTY: GARY ELLIS

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON COMPLAINT FILED 10/26/2020 OF GARY ELLIS AS TO ARB, INC. WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/04/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketCHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketCASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 39

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 3/15/21 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 39

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketCLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 12/30/20 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 39

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketCOMPLEX LITIGATION DESIGNATION FEE ON COMPLAINT FILED 10/26/2020 OF GARY ELLIS PAID BY ONE LEGAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketCASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 10/26/2020 OF GARY ELLIS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketCOLOR OF FILE IS PINK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ARB INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARTER JAMES P.