This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 02/15/2020 at 12:25:27 (UTC).

ELIZABETH NICOLE FOSTER VS PEDRO SANTOS RIVERA

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 ELIZABETH NICOLE FOSTER filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against PEDRO SANTOS RIVERA. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0798

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ELIZABETH NICOLE FOSTER

Hercules, CA 94547

Respondent

PEDRO EMILIO SANTOS RIVERA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2025
  • DocketCLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS (DISMISSAL, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketCLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS (JUDGMENT OR CASE STATUS STATEMENT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketCLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS (JUDGMENT OR CASE STATUS STATEMENT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketCLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 6 MONTHS (RESPONSE OR DEFAULT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketCLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 3 MONTHS (PROOF OF SERVICE, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 8/12/21 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS WAS SET FOR 2/12/25 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCOLOR OF FILE (FAMILY LAW): YELLOW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • Docket(FAMILY LAW) SUMMONS ON DISSOLUTION WITH CHILDREN FILED 02/14/2020 OF ELIZABETH FOSTER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 3 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 5/14/20 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 6 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 8/12/20 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 2/16/21 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 18

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.