This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 08/03/2016 at 15:19:20 (UTC).

ELIASER VS SMITH

Case Summary

On 10/20/2011 ELIASER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SMITH. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Concord Superior Court located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0682

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALAN MICHAEL ELIASER

Concord, CA 94521

Defendant

JAYHE SMITH

Pleasant Hill, CA 94523

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2012
  • ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2012
  • REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO THE ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS SAD BEFORE HEARING - ENTRY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL; Disposition: NOT HEARD/CONT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2011
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL; Disposition: NOT HEARD/CONT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2011
  • PLTF APPEARS AT CNTR TO CONT COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2011
  • ORDER FILED ON WAIVER OF FEES AS TO ALAN MICHAEL ELIASER IS GRANTED.; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2011
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY ALAN MICHAEL ELIASER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2011
  • WAIVER ORDER SUBMITTED TO COMMISSIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2011
  • A SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL HAS BEEN SET FOR 12/16/11 AT 9:30 IN DEPT. 54

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2011
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2011
  • COLOR OF FILE IS YELLOW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2011
  • CLAIM AND ORDER TO PLAINTIFF FOR PERSONAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2011
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED (CLAIM GREATER THAN $1,500.00, UP TO $5,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2011
  • AMOUNT OF CLAIM - $2,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less