Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 04/24/2019 at 22:09:28 (UTC).

EH CLEAN VS SAVAR

Case Summary

On 08/31/2012 EH CLEAN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SAVAR. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Walnut Creek Superior Court located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0637

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Walnut Creek Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EH CLEAN, INC

P.O.Box 711

Alamo, CA 94507

Defendant

ARASH SAVAR

Alamo, CA 94507

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED TO ALL PARTIES ON 12/06/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2012
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT WAS MAILED TO ALL PARTIES ON 12/06/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT ENTERED BY DEFAULT ON 12/05/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2012
  • SUBSTITUTE PROOF OF SERVICE ON CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 08/31/2012 OF EH CLEAN, INC AS TO ARASH SAVAR FILED. DATE OF MAILING 11/17/12. FEE FOR SERVICE $64.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2012
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED UNSERVED ON THE CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 08/31/2012 OF EH CLEAN, INC AS TO DEFENDANT ARASH SAVAR. REASON NOT SERVED: ATTEMPTED NOT KNOWN/UTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2012
  • CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM SENT TO THE FOLLOWING PARTIES:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2012
  • COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2012
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS GRAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 10/24/12 AT 10:30 IN DEPT. 59

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2012
  • COPY OF SMALL CLAIMS CLAIM AND ORDER ON CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 08/31/2012 OF EH CLEAN, INC SENT CERTIFIED MAIL BY CLERK THIS DATE TO: ARASH SAVAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2012
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED (CLAIM UP TO $1,500.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2012
  • AMOUNT OF CLAIM: $1,215.00

    Read MoreRead Less