This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 11:43:12 (UTC).

EFRAIN C ALVARADO-AVILA VS SABRINA BRUNNER

Case Summary

On 01/03/2017 EFRAIN C ALVARADO-AVILA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SABRINA BRUNNER. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0001

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

EFRAIN C ALVARADO-AVILA

ERIC LOPEZ

MERCEDES GEROMINO LOPEZ

Defendants

CHERYL DEMBE

DONALD BRUNNER

SABRINA LYNDLEY BRUNNER

ESTATE OF DONALD BRUNNER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CONLOGUE, KEVIN S

15456 Ventura Blvd Ste 304

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

Defendant Attorney

WELCH, MICHAEL

6210 Stoneridge Mall Road Suite 550

Pleasanton, CA 94588

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2018
  • CHECK FOR DISMISSAL ON CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITH PREJUDICEAS TO ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • SPECIAL SET HEARING ON: FURTHER CMC/TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET BY DEPT. 9; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • SPECIAL SET HEARING ON: FURTHER CMC/TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET BY DEPT. 9; Disposition: NOT HEARD/CONT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT ON COMPLAINT FILED 01/03/2017 OF EFRAIN ALVARADO-AVILA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • CLERKS TICKLER FOR DISMISSAL WAS SET FOR 8/03/18 AT 7:00 ON 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • RETURN TO COURT CONTROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • CIVIL SAD BEFORE TRIAL - REQ. DISM. - NO ADR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • CASE DISPOSITIONED - SETTLED CONDITIONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 05/15/2017
  • DECLARATION OF MIA HONG FILED RE: OSC FOR NON SERVICE OF DEFEDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY EFRAIN C ALVARADO-AVILA, MERCEDES GEROMINO LOPEZ, ERIC LOPEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE; Disposition: OSC ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 01/03/2017 OF EFRAIN ALVARADO-AVILA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • COLOR OF FILE IS RED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 5/23/17 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 3/13/17 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.