This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 04/25/2019 at 09:13:19 (UTC).

EARLS VS. SOUTHWEST

Case Summary

On 08/10/2016 EARLS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SOUTHWEST. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Richmond Superior Court - George D Carroll Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0398

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Richmond Superior Court - George D Carroll Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SHONNA EARL

Richmond, CA 94801

SHONNA EARLS

Richmond, CA 94801

Defendant

SOUTHWEST AIRLINES, CO

2702 Lovefields Dr.

Dallas, TX 75235

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED TO ALL PARTIES ON 03/14/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 03/14/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR FOR SOUTHWEST AIRLINES,CO FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL; Disposition: SUBMITTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON 1ST AMENDED CLAIM OF PLTF OF SHONNA EARLS AS TO DEFENDANT SOUTHWEST AIRLINES,CO FILED. DATE OF SERVICE 12/29/16. FEE FOR SERVICE $70.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL; Disposition: Continued - Not Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2016
  • CASE RESET FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL; Disposition: Continued - Not Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL; Disposition: Continued - Not Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/20/2016
  • CASE RESET FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY SHONNA EARLS (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AS TO SHONNA EARLS IS GRANTED; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • COLOR OF FILE IS PINK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • CLAIM AND ORDER TO PLAINTIFF FOR PERSONAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED (CLAIM UP TO $1,500.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • AMOUNT OF CLAIM $896.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL WAS SET FOR 9/26/16 AT 13:15 IN DEPT. 54

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • UPDATE PARTY CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 08/10/2016 OF SHONNA EARLS

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.