This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 08/26/2019 at 16:35:40 (UTC).

DYMENT VS. SOZANSKI

Case Summary

On 06/21/2019 DYMENT filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SOZANSKI. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Richmond Superior Court - George D Carroll Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0397

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JENNIFER DYMENT

Defendants

ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

CHRISTINE SOZANSKI

El Cerrito, CA 94530

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CLEMENTS, DENZIL E

3150 Hilltop Mall Dr #35

Richmond, CA 94806

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2019
  • DocketUPDATE PARTY UD COMPLAINT FILED 06/21/2019 OF JENNIFER DYMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketUD TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION BY JL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketCLERK`S TICKLER DATE WAS SET FOR 8/22/19 AT 16:30 IN DEPT. 54

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketCOURT TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: SUBMITTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketCOURT TRIAL - U.D. WAS SET FOR 8/22/19 AT 13:15 IN DEPT. 54

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED ON THE UD COMPLAINT FILED 06/21/2019 OF JENNIFER DYMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketMEMORANDUM TO SET CASE FOR COURT TRIAL FILED BY JENNIFER DYMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketALL OTHER OCCUPANTS ADDED AS A PARTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS FOR PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ON 07/18/19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketREQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 06/21/2019 OF JENNIFER DYMENT FILED AS TO DEFENDANT ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AS TO CHRISTINE SOZANSKI IS GRANTED; Disposition: Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketANSWER TO UD COMPLAINT FILED 06/21/2019 OF JENNIFER DYMENT FILED BY CHRISTINE SOZANSKI REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketREQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY CHRISTINE SOZANSKI (CONFIDENTIAL)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketORDER TO POST SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketAPPLICATION/DECLARATION FOR ORDER TO POST SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketHEARING SET FOR DISPOSITION DATE ON 8/06/19 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 2CLK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 06/21/2019 OF JENNIFER DYMENT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketCOLOR OF FILE IS BLUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED (UNDER $10,000). SUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less