Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 09/07/2016 at 14:26:44 (UTC).

DRUMMER VS SEECON

Case Summary

On 08/24/2011 DRUMMER filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against SEECON. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2058

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2011

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FERNANDO TANEDO

SUMITA VISHWASRAO

JOHN GUERIN

ANA SANCHEZ

GLADYS TORRES

FLORANCE GREEN

JUAN SANCHEZ

MALCOLM COWLER

Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

ACE LATHING, INC.

ASSOCIATED MATERIALS INCORPORATS INCORPORAT

T&C ROOFING, INC

MOES 1-100

JSA GENERAL CONTRACTOR, INC.

PREFERRED WINDOW PRODUCTS, INCORPORATED

CAL WEST BUILDING AND CONCRETE, INC.

S&K- NELLIS PAINTING, INC.

RT/DT, INC.

LASTER LANDSCAPE CONSTRUCTION,INC

ZOES 1-200

MASCO CONTRACTOR SERVICES OF CALIFORNIA INC

120 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MASTERSON, MARK J

2800 Donald Douglas Loop North

Santa Monica, CA 90405

Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

MEYER, RAYMOND

20320 S.W. Birch 2Nd Floor

Newport Beach, CA 92660

RUSHFORD, JAMES W

1010 Hurley Way Suite 410

Sacramento, CA 95825

LEVY, DAVID M.

1600 South Main Plaza, Suite 325

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

VAN DE POEL, JOHN F

1600 South Main Plaza Suite 325

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Other Attorneys

KEEGAN LAW FIRM

160 W Santa Clara St #1400

San Jose, CA 95113

NAGPAL, VIK

501 W Broadway Suite 1750

San Diego, CA 92101

CORRELL, DEBORAH A

P.O. Box 293328

Sacramento, CA 95829

ISERT-KOTT,ESQ, ILENE

1300 Oliver Rd Ste. 240

Fairfield, CA 94534

ELGUINDY, JOSEPH M

2990 Lava Ridge Court Suite 205

Roseville, CA 95661

YEN, THOMAS

525 Market Street Suite 2850

San Francisco, CA 94105

LUCIA, CHRISTIAN P

1800 Sutter Street Suite 460

Concord, CA 94520

WELCH, STEPHEN B

P.O. Box 8035 2033 N. Main Street #800

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

SCHROEDER, EDWARD C

33 New Montgomery Street Sixth Floor

San Francisco, CA 54537

TISDALE, SAMANTHA

515 South Flower St Forty-Second Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

JORGENSEN, YVONNE J.

Van De Poel & Levy 1600 S. Main Plaza, Ste 325

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

FISCHER, TODD A

888 Munras Ave

Monterey, CA 93940

MARDEN, STEVEN M

3900 Newpark Mall Road Suite 331

Newark, CA 94560

TOWNSEND, KASEY C

275 Battery Street Suite 850

San Francisco, CA 94111

PETERSON, PATRICIA J

215 Lennon Lane Suite 200

Walnut Creek, CA 94598

3 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2015
  • COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT AS TO STAIRBUILDERS INC FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED. JOSEPH M ELGUINDY SUBSTITUTES OUT AS ATTORNEY FOR SEECON FINANCIAL AND CONSTRUCTION AND IS REPLACED BY CHRISTIAN P LUCIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • ELECTRONIC FILING TRANSACTION FEE COLLECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY BY SEECON FINANCIAL AND CONSTRUCTION (IMAGE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • NOTICE OF/TO CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY STAIRBUILDERS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT AS TO NEWKIRK CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC. FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2015
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: FAILURE TO DISPOSITION CASE; Disposition: DISCHARGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2015
  • PROPOSED ORDER RE DGFS OF STAIRBUILDERS, INC. RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
648 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2011
  • PHONG PHAM, EDSEL BALAGTAS, ELSA BALAGTAS, FLORO CATANIAG, NORA CATANIAG, KIM CHO, MALCOLM COWLER, DEBORAH PACHECO COWLER, RIZAL EDNALINO ADDED AS A PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2011
  • TINA DRUMMER, DAVEY LEGASPI, MARIA- MORENA OLAGUIR, REINALDO GUTERRES, EMMA LIM, SARA MORALES, JOSE MARTINEZ, SUMITA VISHWASRAO, THUTHUY PHAMLE ADDED AS A PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2011
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 08/24/2011 OF RAYMOND DRUMMER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2011
  • COLOR OF FILE IS BLUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2011
  • COMPLEX LITIGATION DESIGNATION FEE ON COMPLAINT FILED 08/24/2011 OF RAYMOND DRUMMER PAID BY PLAINTIFFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2011
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2011
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 11/01/11 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2011
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 10/11/11 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2011
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2011
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Preferred Window Products Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where ACE LATHING,INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Associated Materials, LLC, a limited liability company is a litigant

Latest cases where T & C ROOFING, INC. is a litigant