Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 03/21/2019 at 23:14:34 (UTC).

DONG VS. SHAPELL

Case Summary

On 06/29/2016 DONG filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against SHAPELL. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2346

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

STEVEN DONG

ZAKI FAMILY TRUST

LORENA BATONGBACAL

FRANKLIN CHAMPACO

SCOTT CLAY

AUDRA CLAY

SUNIL DADLANI

MEETA DADLANI

DAN DELEON

JENNIFER DELEON

SAMAN DIAS

JAMES GUO

SAMEER GUPTA

SEONG HEO

XUAN HUANG

VICTOR HUIE

EDWARD KATZ

KOOKHWAN KWON

SOON KWON

JAYAPRADHA LAKARUSU

102 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MILSTEIN ADELMAN, LLP

2800 Donald Douglas Loop North

Santa Monica, CA 90405

MILSTEIN ADELMAN JACKSON FAIRCHILD & WADE L

10250 Constellation Boulevard Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Other Attorneys

SANDERS, BRIAN M

2300 Clayton Road Suite 350

Concord, CA 94520

LONGO, DAN L

18201 Von Karman Ave. Ste.1100

Irvine, CA 92612

WASINDA, JOHN J.

1855 Grant Street, Ste.800-B, 8Th Floor

Concord, CA 94520

HARRIS, DAVID A

393.0 Civic Center Drive Suite 300

Fremont, CA 94538

PETERSON, PATRICIA J

215 Lennon Lane Suite 200

Walnut Creek, CA 94598

BERDING, TYLER P

2175 North California Blvd Suite 500

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

MEYER, RAYMOND

300 Frank H Ogawa Plaza Suite 355

Oakland., CA 94612

LUCIA, CHRISTIAN P

201 North Civic Drive Suite 145

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

CAPPELLUTI, LISA M.

150 Post St, Suite 700

San Francisco, CA 94108

BEEBY, DAVID E.

1600 South Main Plaza Suite 325

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

ADELMAN, FRED

2800 Donald Douglas Loop North

Santa Monica, CA 90405

METHVEN, BRUCE E

2232 Sixth Street

Berkeley, CA 94710

AGUILERA, A ERIC

650 Town Center Drive Suite 100

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

MARTHA, RICHARD H.

980 Ninth Street 16Th Floor

Sacramento, CA 95814

BRILLIANT, RACHEL K

275 Battery Street, Ste.850

San Francisco, CA 94111

BOOTH, EILEEN T

2401 American River Drive Suite 100

Sacramento, CA 95825

SILVER, CRAIG J

1525 Mesa Verde Dr. E. Ste210

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

FLAHERTY, TIMOTHY M.

One Embarcadero Center Ste 400

San Francisco, CA 94111

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2019
  • CHECK FOR DISMISSALS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • ELECTRONIC FILING TRANSACTION FEE COLLECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • ELECTRONIC FILING TRANSACTION FEE COLLECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • REQUEST FILED & DISMISSAL ENTERED CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 03/03/2014 OF SHAPELL INDUSTRIESINC AS TO DEFENDANT AMERICAN ENGINEERING CONTRACTORS INC, DELLA MAGGIORE TILE, INC, ELEGANT SURFACES, ELITE CUSTOM STAIRS, INC, GOULART MASONRY & CONCRETE INC, J.C.HEATING & AIR CONDITIONINGINC WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • CHECK FOR DISMISSALS; Disposition: NOT HEARD/CONT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • ELECTRONIC FILING TRANSACTION FEE COLLECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • ELECTRONIC FILING TRANSACTION FEE COLLECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • REQUEST FILED & DISMISSAL ENTERED CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 03/03/2014 OF SHAPELL INDUSTRIESINC AS TO DEFENDANT ATLANTIC CONCRETE INC, BARBOSA CABINETS INC, D&E DRYWALL INC, HEARTWOOD CABINETS, MARBLE PALACE INC, PACIFIC RIM PLUMBING INC, F RODGERS CORPORATION, SUMMIT STAIR COMPANY, INC. WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
635 More Docket Entries
  • 12/11/2013
  • REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO PLAINTIFF MICHAEL YU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2013
  • YOON LIOW, FRANK MEEHAN, HUNG NGUYEN, ALPESH PARMAR, KINJAL PARMAR, WEI PENG, NAGARAJA PERUGUPALLI, RAMANI PERUGUPALLI, RAJANIKANTH RALLAPALLI, NORMAN RAMIREZ ADDED AS A PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2013
  • ZAKI FAMILY TRUST, LORENA BATONGBACAL, FRANKLIN CHAMPACO, SCOTT CLAY, AUDRA CLAY, SUNIL DADLANI, MEETA DADLANI, DAN DELEON, JENNIFER DELEON, SAMAN DIAS ADDED AS A PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2013
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 12/23/13 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2013
  • COMPLEX LITIGATION DESIGNATION FEE ON COMPLAINT FILED 11/06/2013 OF STEVEN DONG PAID BY PLAINTIFFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2013
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2013
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 11/06/2013 OF STEVEN DONG FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2013
  • COLOR OF FILE IS LAVENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2013
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 2/13/14 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2013
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRILLIANT, RACHEL K

Latest cases represented by Lawyer METHVEN, BRUCE E.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Berding, Tyler P.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SANDERS, BRIAN M.