This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 08:58:30 (UTC).

DIANA V NIPPER VS MARK A NIPPER

Case Summary

On 06/01/2018 DIANA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against NIPPER. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2465

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DIANA V NIPPER

Danville, CA 94526

Respondent

MARK A NIPPER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DONSBACH, PAUL F

1990 N. California Blvd. 8Th Floor

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Respondent Attorney

MERCADO, TAMMY J

Law Office Of Tammy J Mercado 2430 Camino Ramon, Suite 325

San Ramon, CA 94583

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2023
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS (DISMISSAL, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS (JUDGMENT OR CASE STATUS STATEMENT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • FAMILY LAW COURT TRIAL ESTIMATED AT 06:00 HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • FAMILY LAW COURT TRIAL ESTIMATED AT 06:00 HOURS.; Disposition: NOT HEARD/CONT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS (JUDGMENT OR CASE STATUS STATEMENT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • PETITIONERS MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATE MENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • RESPONDENTS SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • PH # UPDATED FOR ATTY PAUL F DONSBACH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • F/L FIRST CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 06/01/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS WAS SET FOR 5/31/23 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • (FAMILY LAW) SUMMONS ON DISSOLUTION WITHOUT CHILDREN FILED 06/01/2018 OF DIANA NIPPER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 3 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 8/30/18 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 6 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 11/28/18 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 6/03/19 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 12/02/19 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • COLOR OF FILE (FAMILY LAW): GOLDENROD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.