This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 07/17/2017 at 17:17:40 (UTC).

DHALIWAL VS PAGE

Case Summary

On 07/09/2014 DHALIWAL filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against PAGE. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Richmond Superior Court - George D Carroll Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0680

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2016
  • DocketHEARING ON OSC RE: JUDGMENT/DISMISSAL; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • DocketREQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITH PREJUDICEAS TO ENTIRE ACTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • DocketCIVIL SAD BEFORE TRIAL - REQ. DISM. - NO ADR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • DocketENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • DocketHEARING ON OSC WAS SET FOR 4/07/16 AT 13:15 IN DEPT. 54

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • DocketCHECK FOR JUDGMENT/DISMISSAL; Disposition: OSC ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2014
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINERS NOT DISPOSITIONED OR IN THE COURT CONTROL WITH IN 45 DAYS; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2014
  • DocketCLERK`S TICKLER DATE WAS SET FOR 2/16/16 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 2CLK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2014
  • DocketMEDIATED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2014
  • DocketCOURT TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/16/2014
  • DocketMEMORANDUM TO SET CASE FOR COURT TRIAL FILED BY BALJIT DHALIWAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2014
  • DocketREQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY REGINA RENEE PAGE (CONFIDENTIAL)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2014
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AS TO REGINA RENEE PAGE IS GRANTED; Disposition: Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2014
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED RE: ANSWER/3K DEFECTIVE NOTICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2014
  • DocketANSWER TO UD COMPLAINT FILED 07/09/2014 OF BALJIT DHALIWAL FILED BY REGINA RENEE PAGE REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2014
  • DocketHEARING SET FOR DISPOSITION DATE ON 8/23/14 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 2CLK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2014
  • DocketORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 07/09/2014 OF BALJIT DHALIWAL FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2014
  • DocketCOLOR OF FILE IS PURPLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2014
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2014
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED (UNDER $10,000). SUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less