This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 01/04/2017 at 14:59:57 (UTC).

DEUTSCHE BANK VS CARDONA

Case Summary

On 10/15/2010 DEUTSCHE BANK filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CARDONA. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Contra Costa County Walnut Creek Superior Court located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0528

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2010

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY

Defendants

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

MIRNA CARDONA

Orinda, CA 94563

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SEYLER, DANA J

20955 Pathfinder Road, Ste 300

Diamond Bar, CA 91765

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2015
  • DocketCLERKS NOTICE TO DESTROY EXHIBITS MAILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2011
  • DocketRETURNED WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA (WRIT OF POSSESSION) COUNTY. RETURNED FULLY SATISFIED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2011
  • DocketCLERK CALLED PLTF ATTY @ 3:12 PM & LEFT MESSAGE RE ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2011
  • DocketCLERK CALLED DFT @ 2:50 PM & LEFT MESSAGE RE ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2011
  • DocketCLERK CALLED CCSO @ 2:56 PM & LEFT MESSAGE RE ORDE R.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2011
  • DocketORDER ON STAY OF EVICTION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2011
  • DocketPETITION FOR STAY OF EXECUTION FILED BY MIRNA CARDONA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2011
  • DocketCLERK CALLED PLTF ATTY @ 11:58 AM & SPOKE TO ANGEL A RE ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2011
  • DocketCLERK CALLED DFT @ 11:51 AM & SPOKE TO JOSE RE ORD ER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2011
  • DocketCLERK CALLED CCSO 11:49 AM SPOKE TO ERICKA RE ORDE R

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2010
  • DocketOSC RE FAILURE TO DISPOSE OF UD CASE SET FOR HEARING ON 1/07/11 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 34

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2010
  • DocketCLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SENT TO THE FOLLOWING PARTIES:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2010
  • DocketORDER TO POST SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2010
  • DocketAPPLICATION/DECLARATION FOR ORDER TO POST SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2010
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE OVER 45 DAYS FROM FILING; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2010
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2010
  • DocketSET FOR TRACKING UD CASE ON 11/29/10 AT 7:00 IN DEPT 1CLK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2010
  • DocketCOLOR OF FILE IS PINK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2010
  • DocketORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 10/15/2010 OF DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2010
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED (UP TO $10,000). SUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee, in Trust for Registered Holders of Long Beach Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-6, Asset-backed Certificates, Series 2006-6 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SEYLER DANA JAE