This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 05/01/2019 at 03:32:19 (UTC).

DELTA VS. GEDDES

Case Summary

On 06/24/2016 DELTA filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GEDDES. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Pittsburg Superior Court - Richard E Arnason Justice Center located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0648

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DELTA VIEW FAMILY APARTMENTS LP

Defendant

HELEN R. GEDDES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROTHBARD, TODD

100 Saratoga Avenue Suite 200

Santa Clara, CA 95051

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2017
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA (WRIT OF POSSESSION) RETURNED FULLY SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • FAILURE TO DISPOSITION UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE OVER 45 DAYS FROM FILING DATE; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2016
  • RETURNED MAIL: NTC OF FILING UD CASE FROM ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS ATTEMPTED NOT KNOWN UNABLE TO FORWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA (WRIT OF POSSESSION) COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ON 07/14/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED AS TO ALL REMAINING DOES ON THE COMPLAINT OF UD COMPLAINT FILED 06/24/2016 OF DELTA VIEW FAMILY APARTMENTS LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 06/24/2016 OF DELTA VIEW FAMILY APARTMENTS LP FILED AS TO DEFENDANT HELEN R. GEDDES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON THE UD COMPLAINT FILED 06/24/2016 OF DELTA VIEW FAMILY APARTMENTS LP AGAINST DEFENDANT HELEN R. GEDDES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • SUBSTITUTE PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 06/24/2016 OF DELTA VIEW FAMILY APARTMENTS LP AS TO DEFENDANT HELEN R. GEDDES WITH MAILING DATE OF 06/27/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER OVER 45 DAYS WAS SET FOR 8/08/16 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. 4CLK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 06/24/2016 OF DELTA VIEW FAMILY APARTMENTS LP FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • COLOR OF FILE IS GREEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED (UNDER $10,000). SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rothbard, Todd B.