Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 05/01/2019 at 02:31:58 (UTC).

DELIVERANCE TEMPLE I & II V HEARD

Case Summary

On 05/09/2016 DELIVERANCE TEMPLE I II filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against HEARD. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Richmond Superior Court - George D Carroll Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0363

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Richmond Superior Court - George D Carroll Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DELIVERANCE TEMPLEI & II APARTMENTS

Defendant

MEACHELLE HEARD

Richmond, CA 94804

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIROTA, STEPHEN M.

9 Crow Canyon Ct Suite #210

San Ramon, CA 94583

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2017
  • RETURNED WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA (WRIT OF POSSESSION) COUNTY RETURNED WHOLLY SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • ORDER DENYING STAY OF EXECUTION OF JUDGMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • DECLARATION OF STEPHEN SIROTA FILED RE: OPPOSITION TO STAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • NOTIFIED PLTF.S ATTY. RE: FILED STAY; 2 HR WINDOW GIVEN FOR APPROVAL OR OPPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • PETITION FOR STAY OF EXECUTION FILED BY MEACHELLE HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA (WRIT OF POSSESSION) COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF JUDGMENT SENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED - UNCONTESTED COURT TRIAL ON 08/04/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • COURT TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: ORDERED I

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS/PHONE NUMBER FILED BY STEPHEN M. SIROTA

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 06/23/2016
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: FAILURE TO DISPOSITION U.D. CASE WAS SET FOR 7/14/16 AT 13:15 IN DEPT. 54

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY MEACHELLE HEARD (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AS TO MEACHELLE HEARD IS GRANTED; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • ANSWER TO UD COMPLAINT FILED 05/09/2016 OF DELIVERANCE TEMPLEI & II APARTMENTS FILED BY MEACHELLE HEARD REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • UPDATE PARTY UD COMPLAINT FILED 05/09/2016 OF DELIVERANCE TEMPLEI & II APARTMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • HEARING SET FOR DISPOSITION DATE ON 6/24/16 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 2CLK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 05/09/2016 OF DELIVERANCE TEMPLEI & II APARTMENTS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • COLOR OF FILE IS LAVENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED (UNDER $10,000). SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIROTA, STEPHEN M.