Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 04/28/2019 at 11:10:23 (UTC).

D&C LEE VS JACOBS

Case Summary

On 08/23/2012 D C LEE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JACOBS. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Richmond Superior Court - George D Carroll Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1254

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Richmond Superior Court - George D Carroll Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

D&C LEE SECOND LP

345 Gellert Blvd., #D

Daly City, CA 94015

Defendant

RONALD ARMAND JACOBS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2013
  • RETURNED WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA (WRIT OF POSSESSION) COUNTY RETURNED WHOLLY UN SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2012
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINERS NOT DISPOSITIONED OR IN THE COURT CONTROL WITH IN 45 DAYS; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2012
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA (WRIT OF POSSESSION) COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2012
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO SAN MATEO COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2012
  • DECLARATION OF CHRISTINA LEE FILED RE: DAILY RENTAL VALUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2012
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ON 09/04/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2012
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 08/23/2012 OF D&C LEE SECOND LP FILED AS TO DEFENDANT RONALD ARMAND JACOBS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2012
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON THE UD COMPLAINT FILED 08/23/2012 OF D&C LEE SECOND LP AGAINST DEFENDANT RONALD ARMAND JACOBS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 08/23/2012 OF D&C LEE SECOND LP AS TO DEF ENDANT RONALD ARMAND JACOBS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/24/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • HEARING SET FOR DISPOSITION DATE ON 10/09/12 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 2CLK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 08/23/2012 OF D&C LEE SECOND LP FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS GRAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED (UNDER $10,000). SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less