This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/14/2017 at 16:16:18 (UTC).

DARRELL STOCK VS. CENTEX HOMES

Case Summary

On 02/26/2013 DARRELL STOCK filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against CENTEX HOMES. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Other - Consolidated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0428

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2013

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DARRELL STOCK

SHYAM LAKSHAM

DEEPA VENKATACHALAM

SUSHANTA CHAKRABORTY

GOPA BANER

RAVINDRANATH AYEETHA

RAVINDRA DUMPA

ADOLFO FRIAS

OLIVIA FRIAS

SUDHAKAR GOURAVARAM

USHA GOURAVARAM

CHUANHU HE

RONALD HIDAYAT

LANQIAN JU

GEORGE KOZAK

MARYNA KOZAK

CHANGE LEE

ALDABELLA LEE

LEOPOLD LUEDDEMANN

JULIE LUEDDEMANN

8 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOUGH, SARAH L

2800 Donald Douglas Loop North

Santa Monica, CA 90405

Other Attorneys

O'CONNELL, DANIEL

1333 N. California Blvd. Suite 600

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2014
  • DEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM 09 TO 17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2013
  • ALL FURTHER DOCUMENTS TO BE FILED IN MASTER CASE # C11-02865

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2013
  • THIS CASE CONSOLIDATED WITH MASTER CASE C11-02865

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2013
  • ACTIONS CONSOLIDATED WITH MASTER CASE CIV/MSC11-02865

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2013
  • CIVIL SAD BEFORE TRIAL - CONSOLIDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2013
  • CASE DISPOSITIONED BY CONSOLIDATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2013
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2013
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY DARRELL STOCK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2013
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: NOT HEARD/CONT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2013
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: NOT HEARD/CONT

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 05/06/2013
  • PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON COMPLAINT FILED 02/26/2013 OF DARRELL STOCK AS TO CENTEX HOMES WITH SERVICE DATE OF 05/03/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2013
  • PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON COMPLAINT FILED 02/26/2013 OF DARRELL STOCK AS TO CENTEX REAL ESTATE WITH SERVICE DATE OF 05/03/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2013
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Complete

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2013
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2013
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 02/26/2013 OF DARRELL STOCK FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2013
  • COLOR OF FILE IS YELLOW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2013
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 5/01/13 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2013
  • COMPLEX LITIGATION DESIGNATION FEE ON COMPLAINT FILED 02/26/2013 OF DARRELL STOCK PAID BY PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2013
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2013
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer O'CONNELL, DANIEL