This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 11:53:27 (UTC).

CYNTHIA FAGREY VS PETER FAGREY

Case Summary

On 04/03/2017 CYNTHIA FAGREY filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against PETER FAGREY. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1558

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CYNTHIA FAGREY

Respondent

PETER FAGREY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LIST, AMANDA J

Ljk Law Group 520 3Rd Street, Suite 205

Oakland, CA 94607

Respondent Attorney

MAZZONCINI, STEPHANIE A

Doyle Quane Family Law Group 571 Hartz Ave

Danville, CA 94526

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2022
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS (DISMISSAL, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • NOTICE OF DEATH OF PARTY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY PERSONAL DELIVERY OF RES CMC STATEMENT ON AMANDA LIST FILED; SERVED ON 09/26/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS (JUDGMENT OR CASE STATUS STATEMENT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • (F/L) CASE MANAGEMENT/PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Disposition: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY PETER FAGREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY CYNTHIA FAGREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONF. STATEMENT ON STEPHANIE MAZZONCINI FILED; SERVED ON 09/24/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • (F/L) CASE MANAGEMENT/PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Disposition: CONTINUED

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 04/03/2017
  • (FAMILY LAW) SUMMONS ON DISSOLUTION WITHOUT CHILDREN FILED 04/03/2017 OF CYNTHIA FAGREY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 3 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 7/03/17 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 6 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 10/02/17 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 4/03/18 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 10/01/18 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS WAS SET FOR 4/04/22 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • COLOR OF FILE (FAMILY LAW): LAVENDER

    Read MoreRead Less