This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 04/29/2019 at 18:31:10 (UTC).

CUNNINGHAM VS MAYFIELD

Case Summary

On 06/04/2014 CUNNINGHAM filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MAYFIELD. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Richmond Superior Court - George D Carroll Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0547

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JACQUELINE CUNNINGHAM

Defendants

SANDRA MAYFIELD

ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CLEMENTS, DENZIL E

3150 Hilltop Mall Dr #35

Richmond, CA 94806

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2014
  • DocketRETURNED WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA (WRIT OF POSSESSION) COUNTY RETURNED FULLY SATISFIED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2014
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINERS NOT DISPOSITIONED OR IN THE COURT CONTROL WITH IN 45 DAYS; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2014
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA (WRIT OF POSSESSION) COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2014
  • DocketREQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 06/04/2014 OF JACQUELINE CUNNINGHAM FILED AS TO DEFENDANT SANDRA MAYFIELD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2014
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED ON THE UD COMPLAINT FILED 06/04/2014 OF JACQUELINE CUNNINGHAM AGAINST DEFENDANT SANDRA MAYFIELD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2014
  • DocketJUDGMENT ENTERED FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ON 07/09/14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2014
  • DocketREQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 06/04/2014 OF JACQUELINE CUNNINGHAM FILED AS TO DEFENDANT ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2014
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED ON THE UD COMPLAINT FILED 06/04/2014 OF JACQUELINE CUNNINGHAM AGAINST DEFENDANT ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2014
  • DocketALL OTHER OCCUPANTS ADDED AS A PARTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2014
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS FOR PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ON 06/18/14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2014
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY POSTING ON DEFENDANT SANDRA MAYFIELD FILED WITH A MAILING DATE OF 06/18/14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2014
  • DocketORDER TO POST SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2014
  • DocketAPPLICATION/DECLARATION FOR ORDER TO POST SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2014
  • DocketCOLOR OF FILE IS GRAY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2014
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2014
  • DocketHEARING SET FOR DISPOSITION DATE ON 7/19/14 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 2CLK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2014
  • DocketORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 06/04/2014 OF JACQUELINE CUNNINGHAM FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2014
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED (UNDER $10,000). SUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CLEMENTS, DENZIL E