This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 04/25/2019 at 09:26:47 (UTC).

CUMMINGS V UBHI

Case Summary

On 06/07/2016 CUMMINGS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against UBHI. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Richmond Superior Court - George D Carroll Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0158

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Richmond Superior Court - George D Carroll Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Others

GAYLE CUMMINGS

Hercules, CA 94547

JOHN CUMMINGS

Hercules, CA 94547

Defendant and Counter Claimant

INDERJIT UBHI

Oakland, CA 94602

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED TO ALL PARTIES ON 07/01/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 06/28/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON CLM OF DEFT FILED 06/07/2016 OF INDERJIT UBHI AS TO DEFENDANT GAYLE CUMMINGS FILED. DATE OF SERVICE 06/13/16. FEE FOR SERVICE $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON CLM OF DEFT FILED 06/07/2016 OF INDERJIT UBHI AS TO DEFENDANT JOHN CUMMINGS FILED. DATE OF SERVICE 06/13/16. FEE FOR SERVICE $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL; Disposition: Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • AMOUNT OF CLAIM $8,024.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • CLAIM OF DEFENDANT FILED BY INDERJIT UBHI (CLAIM GREATER THAN $5,000.00, UP TO $7,500.00 - BY NATURAL PERSONS ONLY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL; Disposition: Continued - Not Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 04/01/2016 OF JOHN CUMMINGS AS TO DEFENDANT INDERJIT UBHI FILED. DATE OF SERVICE 05/03/16. FEE FOR SERVICE $130.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2016
  • CASE RESET FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • COLOR OF FILE IS PINK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • CLAIM AND ORDER TO PLAINTIFF FOR PERSONAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL WAS SET FOR 5/16/16 AT 13:15 IN DEPT. 54

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • AMOUNT OF CLAIM $9,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED (CLAIM GREATER THAN $5,000.00, UP TO $10,000.00 - BY NATURAL PERSONS ONLY)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.