Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 05/30/2017 at 22:48:11 (UTC).

CULANNAY VS. FREDDIE MAC

Case Summary

On 04/19/2012 CULANNAY filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against FREDDIE MAC. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0946

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MELBA CULANNAY

REYNALDO CULANNAY

Defendants

JP MORGAN CHASE BANK NA

DEUTSCHE BANK SECURITIES

COMPUTER SHARE TRUST COMPANY, N.A.

FREDDIE MAC

USB INVESTMENT BANK

CITI

BANC OF AMERICA SECURITIES, LLC

CALIFORNIA RECONVEYANCE COMPANY

LEHMAN BROTHERS

WASHINGTON MUTUAL BANK, FA

QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORPORATION

GOLDMAN, SACHS & CO.

MORGAN STANLEY

FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION

DEUTSCHE BANK SECURITIES INC.

CREDIT SUISSE SECURITIES(USA) LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HENRIOULLE, STEVAN J.

1330 Broadway Suite 1602

Oakland, CA 94612

Defendant Attorneys

CAVE, BRYAN

560 Mission St 25Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94105

BRAJE, KAREN A

101 Second Street Suite 1800

San Francisco, CA 94105-3659

HOFFMAN, NICOLE M

4665 Macarthur Court Suite 200

Newport Beach, CA 92660

ZAK, JONATHAN M

4665 Macarthur Court Suite 200

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2014
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: PLAINTIFFS FAILURE TO DISPOSITION CASE; Disposition: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2014
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: PLAINTIFFS FAILURE TO DISPOSITION CASE; Disposition: NOT HEARD/CONT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2014
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF OSC FILED BY DEPT. 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2014
  • RETURNED MAIL: NOTICE OF HEARING ON OSC, MAILED TO: STEVAN J. HENRIOULLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2014
  • HEARING ON OSC WAS SET FOR 3/27/14 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2013
  • ORDER SUSTAINING DEMURRER OF CREDIT SUISSE TO 1ST AMEND. CMPLNT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2013
  • CHECK FOR DISMISSAL; Disposition: OSC ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2013
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2013
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON/FOR COMPLAINT FILED WITH PROOF OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2013
  • ELECTRONIC FILING TRANSACTION FEE COLLECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
161 More Docket Entries
  • 04/23/2012
  • COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2012
  • COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2012
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2012
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/19/2012 OF REYNALDO CULANNAY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS PURPLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2012
  • NOTICE OF/TO PENDING ACTION FILED BY REYNALDO CULANNAY, MELBA CULANNAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2012
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 10/23/12 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2012
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 6/04/12 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2012
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2012
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITI CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where Banc of America Securities LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where GOLDMAN, SACHS & CO., INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC is a litigant