This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 05/01/2019 at 03:20:20 (UTC).

CTRSHP OF ELLEN AMYX

Case Summary

On 07/18/2018 CTRSHP OF ELLEN AMYX was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1602

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Conservators and Petitioners

JULIE MENACK

Oakland, CA 94609

LINDA BRUNE

Conservatee

ELLEN AMYX

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Conservator and Petitioner Attorneys

REGLI, TRACY S

3478 Buskirk Avenue Suite 300

Pleasant Hill, CA 94523

THOMPSON, JONATHAN T.

1615 Bonanza St #305

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Conservatee Attorney

KORN, KATHRYN

23 Altarinda Rd, Ste 215

Orinda, CA 94563

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2018
  • NOTICE OF/TO OF THE CONSERVATEES DEATH FILED BY JULIE MENACK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED RE: ORDER RE COURT INVESTIGATOR FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • ORDER THAT CTEES ESTATE BE ASSESSED $500.00 FOR INVESTI GATION& RPT BY CT INV. PAYABLE TO ALLIANCEONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • (PROBATE) CONFIDENTIAL REVIEW REPORT OF THE COURT INVESTIGATOR FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • (PROBATE) CONFIDENTIAL MED AND CLETS ADDENDUM TO COURT INVESTIGATOR RPT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • ORDER APPROVING 2ND ACCT & RPT OF CONS W/ PET FOR PERIOD C FEES & CONS, AND ATTY COMPENSATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • HEARING RE: PTN FOR APRVL OF 2ND ACCT & RPT, FOR CMPSTN FILED ON 07/18/18 BY JULIE MENACK; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • ORIGINAL ACCOUNT STATEMENTS FOR SECOND ACCOUNT AND REPORT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION FOR APRVL OF 2ND ACCT & RPT, FEES, CMPSTN FILED (D14 09-07-18 9:00AM) WITH PROOF OF MAILING ON 07

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • HEARING SET FOR 9/07/18 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 14

    Read MoreRead Less
59 More Docket Entries
  • 12/23/2014
  • (PROBATE) CONFIDENTIAL CONSERVATOR SCREENING FORM BY JULIE MENACK FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2014
  • DUTIES OF CONSERVATOR W/ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT, SIGNED BY JULIE MENACK (HANDBOOK RECEIVED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2014
  • (PROBATE) CONFIDENTIAL SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION BY ELLEN AMYX FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2014
  • HEARING SET FOR 2/06/15 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2014
  • TEMPORARY CONSERVATORSHIP PETITION FOR APPT OF TEMP CTR OF PERS/ESTATE FILED BY LINDA BRUNE, JULIE MENACK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2014
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2014
  • COLOR OF FILE IS RED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2014
  • PETITION FOR CONSERVATORSHIP OF THE PERSON AND THEESTATE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2014
  • REFEREE TDT IS ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2014
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 14

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KORN, KATHRYN S.