This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/17/2017 at 13:40:34 (UTC).

CSAA INSURANCE EXCH VS. 3M PURIFICATION INC

Case Summary

On 07/03/2014 CSAA INSURANCE EXCH filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against 3M PURIFICATION INC. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1248

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CSAA INSURANCE EXCHANGE

DILEEP RAMACHANDRAN

NALINI RAMACHANDRAN

LEATRICE BLEVINS

DIANA FONG

KEVIN FONG

CHARLOTTE CROUSE

LUCINDA JACKSON

CRAIG HODGES

CATHY PARIS

WILLIAM COX

JUANITA COX

PAUL BRADSHAW

TERESE BRADSHAW

DOAA VOLLMAR

CHARLES VOLLMAR

Defendants

3M PURIFICATION INC

EMERSON ELECTRIC CO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JANG, ALAN J

1766 Lacassie Avenue Ste 200

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Defendant Attorney

WILLIAMS, JEFFREY R

One Market, Spear Street Tower 32Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2016
  • JURY TRIAL - LONG CAUSE/ 7 DAY(S); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • ISSUE CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • CHECK FOR DISMISSAL; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2015
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2014
  • 5CLKC4 CALENDARED ON 01/20/15 IN DEPT. 31. HAS BEEN UPDATED TO 01/20/15 IN DEPT. 21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2014
  • DEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM 31 TO 21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2014
  • REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITH PREJUDICEAS TO ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2014
  • CLERK`S TICKLER WAS SET FOR 1/20/15 AT 7:00 IN DEPT 31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2014
  • NOTICE OF/TO SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED BY CSAA INSURANCE EXCHANGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2014
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 07/07/2014
  • NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2014
  • CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE SENT TO ALL PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2014
  • DEFAULT DEPARTMENT CHANGED TO 31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2014
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2014
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 07/03/2014 OF CSAA INSURANCE EXCHANGE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2014
  • COLOR OF FILE IS PINK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2014
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 9/05/14 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2014
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 8/18/14 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2014
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2014
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.