This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 07/18/2017 at 05:03:58 (UTC).

CRUZ VS. SHEEHAN

Case Summary

On 06/06/2016 CRUZ filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SHEEHAN. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Pittsburg Superior Court - Richard E Arnason Justice Center located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0377

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pittsburg Superior Court - Richard E Arnason Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAN DELA CRUZ

Pittsburg, CA 94565

Defendant

COREY SHEEHAN

Antioch, CA 94509

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS REFERAL TO MEDIATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL; Disposition: DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • SUBSTITUTE PROOF OF SERVICE ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FILED 06/06/2016 OF JAN DELA CRUZ AS TO COREY SHEEHAN FILED. DATE OF MAILING 09/16/16. FEE FOR SERVICE $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL; Disposition: Continued - Not Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • CASE RESET FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • A SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL WAS SET FOR 11/04/16 AT 8:45 IN DEPT. 57

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • CASE RESET FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • A SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL WAS SET FOR 9/30/16 AT 8:45 IN DEPT. 57

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • A SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL WAS SET FOR 8/05/16 AT 8:45 IN DEPT. 57

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • COLOR OF FILE IS GREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • CLAIM AND ORDER TO PLAINTIFF FOR PERSONAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • AMOUNT OF CLAIM: $7,500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED (CLAIM GREATER THAN $5,000.00, UP TO $10,000.00 - BY NATURAL PERSONS ONLY)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.