Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/01/2017 at 11:49:09 (UTC).

CROSS VS SHEA HOMES LIMITED

Case Summary

On 09/14/2012 CROSS filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against SHEA HOMES LIMITED. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2171

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MIKE CROSS

DENISE CROSS

CANDACE RHODES

Defendants

SHE HOMES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

J.F. SHE CO, INC.

J.F. SHE LLC

SHEA HOMES, INC.

J.F. SHEA CO, INC

J.F. SHEA LLC

SHEA HOMES LIMITEDPARTNERSHIP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GLADSTEIN, ADAM M

GLADSTEIN, AARON

2800 Donald Douglas Loop North

Santa Monica, CA 90405

Defendant Attorney

ZIMMERMAN, ESQ., JON B.

227 North First Street

San Jose, CA 95113

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2013
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2013
  • DISMISSAL FILED/ENTERED ON THE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2013
  • RETURN TO COURT CONTROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2013
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY SHEA HOMES LIMITEDPARTNERSHIP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2013
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY MIKE CROSS, DENISE CROSS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2013
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: CONTINUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2013
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Complete

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2013
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY MIKE CROSS, DENISE CROSS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2013
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY SHEA HOMES LIMITEDPARTNERSHIP, J.F. SHEA CO, INC, J.F. SHEA LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2013
  • NOTICE OF/TO FURTHER CMC FILED BY MIKE CROSS, DENISE CROSS

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2013
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: CONTINUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2013
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY MIKE CROSS, DENISE CROSS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2012
  • CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2012
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2012
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 09/14/2012 OF MIKE CROSS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS GOLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2012
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2012
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2012
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 2/01/13 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2012
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 11/19/12 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SHEA HOMES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP is a litigant

Latest cases where Shea Homes, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where J.F. SHEA CO. INC. AS NOMINEE 1996-1 A NEVADA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZIMMERMAN JON B.