Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/02/2017 at 01:42:45 (UTC).

CROCKER VS. WESTERN PACIFIC HOUSING

Case Summary

On 12/28/2012 CROCKER filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against WESTERN PACIFIC HOUSING. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********3018

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2012

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RICHARD CROCKER

JAMIE CROCKER

PATRICIA BARREDA

JOSEPH LOPIANO

SHERRY BLACKBURN

KENNETH BLACKWELL

EMILIA BLACKWELL

RICHARD BROMLEY

SHARON BROMLEY

NATHAN COX

GREGORY DAY

MATTHEW DEGRISELLES

DENISE DEGRISELLES

BEJAN FARAHBAKHSH

TORREY FARAHBAKHSH

YUEN HOU

SANDRA HOU

TOM HUBBARD

MARY HUBBARD

DARRYL LOUDHOLT

34 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THOMSON, SCOTT J

1990 N. California Boulevard Suite 1060

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Other Attorneys

FISCHER, TODD A

888 Munras Ave

Monterey, CA 93940

KENNEDY, MICHAEL T

100 Pringle Avenue Ste.700

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

PARK, DAVID S

39300 Civic Center Drive Suite 300

Fremont, CA 94538

BUREK, LAWRENCE M

550 North Parkcenter Drive, Ste 204

Santa Ana, CA 92705

HILLIER, ERIC R

1401 Willow Pass Road Suite 700

Concord, CA 94520

BYRNES, A. BARCLAY

2033 N. Main Street Suite 800

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2017
  • JURY TRIAL - LONG CAUSE/ 25 DAY(S); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • ISSUE CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • ELECTRONIC FILING TRANSACTION FEE COLLECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • OPPOSITION TO PLNTFS REQ FOR JUD. NTC. FILED BY WESTERN PACIFIC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • ELECTRONIC FILING TRANSACTION FEE COLLECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • DECLARATION OF NICHOLAS E MA FILED RE: ISO OPPO TO PLNTFS MIL NO.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • OPPOSITION TO PLNTFS MIL NO.6 FILED BY WESTERN PACIFIC HOUSING,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • ELECTRONIC FILING TRANSACTION FEE COLLECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • ISSUE CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY ATTORNEY FOR WESTERN PACIFIC HOUSING, INC., D.R. HORTON, INC., WESTERN PACIFIC HOUSING MANAGEMENT, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
699 More Docket Entries
  • 12/28/2012
  • GREGORY DAY, MATTHEW DEGRISELLES, DENISE DEGRISELLES, BEJAN FARAHBAKHSH, TORREY FARAHBAKHSH, YUEN HOU, SANDRA HOU, TOM HUBBARD, MARY HUBBARD ADDED AS A PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2012
  • JOSEPH LOPIANO, SHERRY BLACKBURN, KENNETH BLACKWELL, EMILIA BLACKWELL, RICHARD BROMLEY, SHARON BROMLEY, NATHAN COX ADDED AS A PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2012
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2012
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/28/2012 OF RICHARD CROCKER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS PURPLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2012
  • COMPLEX LITIGATION DESIGNATION FEE ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/28/2012 OF RICHARD CROCKER PAID BY PLAINTIFFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2012
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 3/01/13 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2012
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 2/11/13 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2012
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2012
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BYRNES, A BARCLAY

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HILLIER, ERIC R

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Park, David Soon

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FISCHER, TODD A