This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 04/27/2019 at 02:40:41 (UTC).

CRESTVIEW PINES VS. EVANS/SMITH

Case Summary

On 01/30/2017 CRESTVIEW PINES filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against EVANS/SMITH. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Pittsburg Superior Court - Richard E Arnason Justice Center located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0123

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pittsburg Superior Court - Richard E Arnason Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CRESTVIEW PINES APARTMENTS LLC

Defendants

REGINALD P. EVANS

TONY R. EVANS

ALEXIS C SMITH

ALL OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEIXLER,ESQ., PAULINE M.

6 "C" Street, Second Floor

Petaluma, CA 94952

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2017
  • PAPERS MAILED TO SUBMITTING PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • MONEY JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 05/16/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • DECLARATION 585D CCP FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • DEC 585 SUBMITTED TO LOWELL RICHARDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA (WRIT OF POSSESSION) RETURNED FULLY SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • FAILURE TO DISPOSITION UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE OVER 45 DAYS FROM FILING DATE; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA (WRIT OF POSSESSION) COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ON 02/24/17

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2017
  • SUBSTITUTE PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 01/30/2017 OF CRESTVIEW PINES APARTMENTS LLC AS TO DEFENDANT ALEXIS C SMITH WITH MAILING DATE OF 02/06/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • SUBSTITUTE PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 01/30/2017 OF CRESTVIEW PINES APARTMENTS LLC AS TO DEFENDANT TONY R. EVANS WITH MAILING DATE OF 02/06/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • SUBSTITUTE PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 01/30/2017 OF CRESTVIEW PINES APARTMENTS LLC AS TO DEFENDANT REGINALD P. EVANS WITH MAILING DATE OF 02/06/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON ALL OCCUPANTS FOR PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ON 02/06/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • ALL OCCUPANTS ADDED AS A PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED (UNDER $10,000). SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER OVER 45 DAYS WAS SET FOR 3/16/17 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. 4CLK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 01/30/2017 OF CRESTVIEW PINES APARTMENTS LLC FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • COLOR OF FILE IS GOLDENROD

    Read MoreRead Less