This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 09/08/2016 at 13:04:20 (UTC).

CREDITORS TRADE VS. ALL COLLECTIONS INC

Case Summary

On 10/18/2010 CREDITORS TRADE filed an Other lawsuit against ALL COLLECTIONS INC. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********3039

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CREDITORS TRADE ASSOCIATION INC

DEPO AUTO WRECKERS

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

WALTER POMPEI

ALL COLLECTIONS INC

Cross Defendants

SARAH SHAKER

INSTITUTO LABORAL DE LA RAZA

Not Classified By Court

CASE MEDIATOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KAPPOS, STEPHEN M.

3785 Brickway Blvd #210

Santa Rosa, CA 95403-9033

BERNSTEIN, BRUCE

2670 Leavenworth St

San Francisco, CA 94133

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

POLLARD, RALPH L.

3330 Main Street

Oakley, CA 94561

Cross Defendant Attorney

PROVENCHER, DOUGLAS

823 Sonoma Ave

Santa Rosa, CA 95404

Not Classified By Court Attorney

BEATTY, ESQ., THOMAS G.

1211 Newell Ave #202 P O Box 5288

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2011
  • SCHEDULED RETURN FROM MEDIATION; Disposition: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2011
  • CHECK FOR DISMISSAL ON CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2011
  • CHECK FOR DISMISSAL; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2011
  • REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITH PREJUDICEAS TO ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2011
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2011
  • CLERK`S TICKLER WAS SET FOR 11/14/11 AT 7:00 IN DEPT 19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2011
  • CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT/DISMISSAL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2011
  • CLERKS TICKLER FOR DISMISSAL WAS SET FOR 11/14/11 AT 7:00 ON 19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2011
  • RETURN TO COURT CONTROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2011
  • CIVIL SAD BEFORE TRIAL - REQ. DISM. - NO ADR

    Read MoreRead Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 12/10/2010
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 12/10/2010 OF ALL COLLECTIONS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2010
  • (U.J.) CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY ALL COLLECTIONS INC, WALTER POMPEI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2010
  • (U.J.) GENERAL DENIAL TO COMPLAINT FILED 10/18/2010 OF CREDITORS TRADE ASSOCIATION INC FILED BY ALL COLLECTIONS INC, WALTER POMPEI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2010
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2010
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 10/18/2010 OF CREDITORS TRADE ASSOCIATION INC FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2010
  • COLOR OF FILE IS BLUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2010
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 3/08/11 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2010
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 12/22/10 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2010
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2010
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where All Collections, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where CREDITORS TRADE ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PROVENCHER, DOUGLAS B.