This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 08/12/2016 at 05:12:38 (UTC).

CREDITOR ADJUSTMENT VS CALEB

Case Summary

On 03/16/2009 CREDITOR ADJUSTMENT filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CALEB. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2532

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC.

Defendant

CALEB TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FREED, KENNETH J.

14226 Ventura Boulevard P.O. Box 5914

Sherman Oaks, CA 91423

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2010
  • RETURN WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED ON 07/31/09 TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY FILED. RETURNED PARTIALLY SATISFIED. IF PARTIAL, SUM OF $667.65

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2010
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2010
  • SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2010
  • STATUS OF 0002 JUDGMENT IS SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2010
  • CLERK'S TICKLER ON CONSUMER CREDIT COLLECTIONS CASE - CHECK FOR FILING OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN 360 DAYS OF FILING COMPLAINT; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2010
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY IN THE AMOUNT OF $7,672.60

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2010
  • DATE MAILED: 02/16/10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2010
  • WE CANNOT FILE/ISSUE YOUR WRIT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2010
  • MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS FILED IN THE AMOUNT OF $647.65

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2010
  • MEMORANDUM OF INTEREST FILED IN THE AMOUNT OF $415.84

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2009
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON THE CONSUMER CREDIT COLLECTIONS CMPL (CRC 3.740) FILED 03/16/2009 OF CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. AGAINST DEFENDANT CALEB TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION BY CLERK AS REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2009
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT COLLECTIONS CMPL (CRC 3.740) FILED 03/16/2009 OF CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. RE: BUSINESS CALEB TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION W/MAILING ON 04/14/09 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2009
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 29

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2009
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON CONSUMER CREDIT COLLECTIONS CMPL (CRC 3.740) FILED 03/16/2009 OF CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2009
  • UPDATE CONSUMER CREDIT COLLECTIONS CMPL (CRC 3.740) FILED 03/16/2009 OF CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2009
  • PLACED ON CLERK'S TICKLER CALENDAR FOR 3/22/10, AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 29

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2009
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2009
  • COLOR OF FILE: YELLOW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2009
  • PLACED ON CLERK'S TICKLER CALENDAR FOR 9/23/09, AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 29

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2009
  • COMPLAINT FILED; SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALEB TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FREED KENNETH JAY