This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 07/17/2017 at 14:01:11 (UTC).

CRAFFEY VS JOHNSON

Case Summary

On 05/29/2014 CRAFFEY filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JOHNSON. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Richmond Superior Court - George D Carroll Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0530

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2014
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2014
  • DocketHEARING ON OSC RE: FAILURE TO FILE JUDGMENT/DISMISSAL; Disposition: DISMISSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2014
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE MEMO RE: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2014
  • DocketRCVD CORRESPONDENCE FROM PATSY CRAFFEY RE: DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2014
  • DocketHEARING ON OSC WAS SET FOR 9/23/14 AT 13:15 IN DEPT. 57

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2014
  • DocketCHECK FOR JUDGMENT/DISMISSAL; Disposition: OSC ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2014
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINERS NOT DISPOSITIONED OR IN THE COURT CONTROL WITH IN 45 DAYS; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2014
  • DocketCLERK`S TICKLER DATE WAS SET FOR 8/29/14 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 2CLK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2014
  • DocketMEDIATED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2014
  • DocketCOURT TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/05/2014
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED RE: UNLAWFUL DETAINER ANSWER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2014
  • DocketREQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY LYNN ANGEL JOHNSON (CONFIDENTIAL)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2014
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AS TO LYNN ANGEL JOHNSON IS GRANTED; Disposition: Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2014
  • DocketANSWER TO UD COMPLAINT FILED 05/29/2014 OF PATSY CRAFFEY FILED BY LYNN ANGEL JOHNSON REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2014
  • DocketFEE RECEIVED FOR ANSWER PACKET FROM LYNN ANGEL JOHNSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2014
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2014
  • DocketHEARING SET FOR DISPOSITION DATE ON 7/15/14 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 2CLK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2014
  • DocketORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 05/29/2014 OF PATSY CRAFFEY FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2014
  • DocketCOLOR OF FILE IS GREY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2014
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED (UNDER $10,000). SUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less