This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 10/27/2022 at 05:37:04 (UTC).

COX VS. CREATIVE INVESTMENT

Case Summary

On 04/12/2022 COX filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against CREATIVE INVESTMENT. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Maier, Clare. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0674

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

Judge Details

Judge

Maier, Clare

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

Cox, Derwin

Defendants and Respondents

Creative Investment Group, Inc.

All Counties Trustee Service, Inc.

Giang, Sendy

Does 1-20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

Cermak, Elizabeth B

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Abb, Wayne Mark

SULLIVAN, THOMAS P.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Continuance

01/11/2023: Notice of Continuance

Notice of Continuance

01/11/2023: Notice of Continuance

Notice of Continuance

01/11/2023: Notice of Continuance

Notice of Continuance

01/11/2023: Notice of Continuance

CMC Notice - Fast Track

01/11/2023: CMC Notice - Fast Track

Proof of Electronic Service

10/18/2022: Proof of Electronic Service

Lodge Order re Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

10/04/2022: Lodge Order re Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

10/04/2022: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

Motion to be Relieved as Counsel filed by Derwin Cox on 10/4/22

10/04/2022: Motion to be Relieved as Counsel filed by Derwin Cox on 10/4/22

Minutes

09/29/2022: Minutes

Minutes

09/29/2022: Minutes

Declaration Filed Re:

04/14/2022: Declaration Filed Re:

Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed

04/14/2022: Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed

Motion Filed To/For

04/14/2022: Motion Filed To/For

Civil Case Cover Sheet

04/12/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued/Filed

04/12/2022: Summons Issued/Filed

Initial Complaint Filed

04/12/2022: Initial Complaint Filed

Initial Complaint Filed

04/12/2022: Initial Complaint Filed

52 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket*Case Management Conference; CMC Notice - Fast Track; Notice of Continuance; Notice of Continuance; Notice of Continuance; Notice of Continuance; Judicial Officer: Maier, Clare; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • Docket*Hearing on Motion in Re:; Judicial Officer: Maier, Clare; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Motion to be Relieved as Counsel filed by Derwin Cox on 10/4/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Electronic Service; Comment: NTC of MTN to be relieved as counsel, emailed on 10/4/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLodge Order/Judgment; Lodge Order re Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel; Comment: Order re Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Re:; Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel; Comment: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion Filed To/For; Motion to be Relieved as Counsel filed by Derwin Cox on 10/4/22; Comment: Motion to be Relieved as Counsel filed by Derwin Cox on 10/4/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer to:; Minutes; Judicial Officer: Maier, Clare; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: First Amended Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer to:; Minutes; Judicial Officer: Maier, Clare; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: First Amended Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply to:; Reply By Defendant Sendy Giang to Plaintiff's Opposition to Demurrer to First Amended Complaint; Comment: Reply By Defendant Sendy Giang to Plaintiff's Opposition to Demurrer to First Amended Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOpposition Filed Re:; Opp to Defs Demurrer to FAC.; Comment: to Demurrer to F.A.C

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Re:; Declaration Filed Re:; Comment: ISO motion to consolidate, or in the alt, stay unlawful detainer action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion Filed To/For; Comment: Consolidate, or in the alt, stay unlawful detainer action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • Cause Of ActionComplaint; Type: Action; Description: Initial complaint filed on 04/12/22; Remedy: Non-Monetary Damages; Amount: $0.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Complaint; File Date: 04/12/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketService of Complaint and Summons; Requested By: Cox, Derwin; Unserved; Unserved; Unserved; Unserved; Unserved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketFee Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued/Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Complaint Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CREATIVE INVESTMENT GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ALL-COUNTIES TRUSTEE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SULLIVAN, THOMAS P.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ABB WAYNE M. ESQ.