Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 09/07/2016 at 10:53:08 (UTC).

COWLES VS WEST COAST

Case Summary

On 07/15/2011 COWLES filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against WEST COAST. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1713

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ASSADULLAH AZAMI

ROSARIO A BERGANTINO

MARITEZ GONZALES

MATTHEW ELIAS

DAISY PIERSON

JUNIE JOY JEUNG

RICKY REDD

Defendants and Cross Defendants

BARBOSA CABINETS, INC.

ASSOCIATED MATERIALS, INCORPORATED

PACIFIC WINDOW CORPORATION

ACE LATHING,INC.

BIANCHI HVAC

ALLSTATE CONTRACT FLOORS, INC.

SIERRA LUMBER & FENCE COMPANY,INC.

MARBLE PALACE, INC.

DEPENDABLE SHEET METAL

CALIFORNIA CUSTOM CARPETS, INC.

VALUE PLUMBING CO

AMERICAN HOME PROS, INC.

ACE LATHING, INC.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

ASSOCIATED MATERIALS, INCORPORATED

176 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PATRON, SUZANNE N.

2800 Donald Douglas Loop North

Santa Monica, CA 90405

Cross Defendant and Defendant Attorneys

LUCIA, CHRISTIAN P

1800 Sutter Street Suite 460

Concord, CA 94520

JONES, TODD A.

301 University Avenue Suite 110

Sacramento, CA 95825

HERP, PAUL A

525 Mark Street Suite 2850

San Francisco, CA 94105

ONETO, JULIE V

101 Second Street Suite 1600

San Francisco, CA 94105

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

RUSHFORD, JAMES W

1010 Hurley Way Suite 410

Sacramento, CA 95825

Other Attorneys

FILER, NORMAN A

500 North State College Blvd Suite 1270

Orange, CA 92868

GUNN, BRIAN H

2301 Dupont Dr

Irvine, CA 92612

WELCH, STEPHEN B

P.O. Box 8035 2033 N. Main Street #800

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

SAMONI, PAUL V

215 Lennon Lane Suite 200

Walnut Creek, CA 94598

MEYER, RYAN N.

2990 Lava Ridge Ct. Suite 205

Roseville, CA 95661

LEVY, DAVID M.

1600 South Main Plaza Suite 325

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

MOKRI, NAMVAR A

4695 Macarthur Court Suite 350

Newport Beach, CA 92660

ELGUINDY, JOSEPH M

2990 Lava Ridge Court Suite 205

Roseville, CA 95661

VAN DE POEL, JOHN F

1600 South Main Plaza Suite 325

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

TISDALE, SAMANTHA

515 South Flower St Forty-Second Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

TAPP, CHAD S

350 University Ave Suite 200

Sacramento, CA 95825

MARDEN, STEVEN M

3900 Newpark Mall Road Suite 331

Newark, CA 94560

TOWNSEND, KASEY C

275 Battery Street Suite 850

San Francisco, CA 94111

BROMGARD, TODD D

Po Box 293328

Sacramento, CA 95829

2 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2015
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: FAILURE TO DISPOSITION THE CASE; Disposition: DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • RECOMMENDATION AND ORDER RE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • HEARING ON OSC WAS SET FOR 10/26/15 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • CHECK FOR DISMISSAL; Disposition: OSC ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • ELECTRONIC FILING TRANSACTION FEE COLLECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • CORRESPONDENCE RECEIVED FROM TODD D BROMGARD RE REC. AND ORD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • ELECTRONIC FILING TRANSACTION FEE COLLECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2015
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: PLAINTIFFS/CROSS-COMPLAINANTS FAILURE TO DISPOSITION CASE; Disposition: DISCHARGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • ELECTRONIC FILING TRANSACTION FEE COLLECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
813 More Docket Entries
  • 07/15/2011
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 10/25/11 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2011
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 8/29/11 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2011
  • UPDATE TRACK ASSIGNMENT TO ELECRONIC FAST TRACK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2011
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2011
  • CASE FILED ELECTRONICALLY- SERVICE PROVIDER IS ONE LEGAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2011
  • COLOR OF FILE IS GOLD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2011
  • COMPLEX LITIGATION DESIGNATION FEE ON COMPLAINT FILED 07/15/2011 OF CASEY COWLES PAID BY PLAINTIFFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2011
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2011
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2011
  • CASE ELECTRONICALLY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ACE LATHING,INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SIERRA LUMBER AND FENCE is a litigant

Latest cases where Associated Materials, LLC, a limited liability company is a litigant

Latest cases where Marble Palace, Inc. is a litigant