This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/17/2017 at 17:27:58 (UTC).

COUNTY OF CONTRA COSTA VS. ROSE AN ALIOTO

Case Summary

On 09/10/2014 COUNTY OF CONTRA COSTA filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against ROSE AN ALIOTO. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1614

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COUNTY OF CONTRA COSTA

Defendants

ROSE ANN ALIOTO

Napa, CA 94558

DIANNE BALZER

BALZER LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

BENNIE ANSELMO

BEVERLY ANSELMO

ALLEN L APPELL

DOROTHY L CADDELL

WILLIAM D CADDELL, II

COLLEEN M CADDELL

WESLEY D CADDELL

ROBIN CADDELL

DOUGLAS C CARROLL

MARGERY ENTWISLE

GLENN LARSEN

MMB FIRST MORTGAGEFUND,LP

MB FIRST MORTGAGE FUND-II LP

MMB FIRST MORTGAGEFUND LLC

JOE FLOYD

JOSEPH FLOYD

41 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANDERSON, SHARON L.

651 Pine Street P.O. Box 69

Martinez, CA 94553

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2016
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: FAILURE TO FILE DISMISSAL; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • NOTICE OF/TO ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY COUNTY OF CONTRA COSTA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITH PREJUDICEAS TO ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • HEARING ON OSC WAS SET FOR 6/29/16 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • CHECK FOR DISMISSAL; Disposition: OSC ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2015
  • STIP & ORDER TO DISBURSE INTERPLEADED FUNDS AND DI SMISS W/PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2015
  • STIP & ORDER TO DISBURSE INTERPLEADER FUNDS AND DI SMISS WITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Complete

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: NOT HEARD/CONT

    Read MoreRead Less
110 More Docket Entries
  • 09/10/2014
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 10/27/14 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2014
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2014
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2014
  • SCOTT D CADDELL ADDED AS A PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2014
  • MICHAEL GILDENGORIN ADDED AS A DEFENDANT/CROSS-DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2014
  • DANIEL THORNER, LINDA A VODZAK, DANIEL J THORNER, LINDA THOMAS, LESLIE THORNTON, ANTHONY A VODZAK, JR, JULIA A VODZAK, KEITH A VODZAK, IRA SERVICE TRUST COMPANY ADDED AS A DEFENDANT/CROSS-DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2014
  • JOHN T TARANTINO, CAMILLE A TARANTINO, CAMILLE A TARANTINO ADDED AS A DEFENDANT/CROSS-DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2014
  • SCOTT D CADDELL, MERNA STRASSNER, PENSCO TRUST COMPANY CUSTODIANFBO MERNA, JOHN T TARANTINO ADDED AS A DEFENDANT/CROSS-DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2014
  • RUTH DARLENE RAGOZZINO ADDED AS A DEFENDANT/CROSS-DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2014
  • ALDO VICTOR VICTOR ADDED AS A DEFENDANT/CROSS-DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.