Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 04/28/2019 at 12:03:10 (UTC).

CONTRA COSTA REAL ESTATE VS LANNING

Case Summary

On 06/05/2012 CONTRA COSTA REAL ESTATE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against LANNING. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Walnut Creek Superior Court located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0232

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Walnut Creek Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CONTRA COSTA REAL ESTATE LLC

Defendants

REINA LANNING

ROBERT LANNING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROTHBARD, TODD

4261 Norwalk Drive #107

San Jose, CA 95129

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2012
  • RETURNED WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA (WRIT OF POSSESSION) COUNTY. RETURNED FULLY SATISFIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2012
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE OVER 45 DAYS FROM FILING; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2012
  • RETURNED WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA (WRIT OF POSSESSION) COUNTY. RETURNED UN SATISFIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2012
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA (WRIT OF POSSESSION) COUNTY; Disposition: WRIT RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2012
  • ORDER THAT WRIT OF POSSESSION BE REISSUED FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2012
  • DECLARATION OF TODD ROTHBARD FILED RE: LOST ORIGINAL WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2012
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA (WRIT OF POSSESSION) COUNTY; Disposition: WRIT RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2012
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ON 06/13/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 06/05/2012 OF CONTRA COSTA REAL ESTATE LLC AS TO DEF ENDANT ROBERT LANNING WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/05/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2012
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 06/05/2012 OF CONTRA COSTA REAL ESTATE LLC FILED AS TO DEFENDANT REINA LANNING, ROBERT LANNING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2012
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON THE UD COMPLAINT FILED 06/05/2012 OF CONTRA COSTA REAL ESTATE LLC AGAINST DEFENDANT REINA LANNING, ROBERT LANNING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 06/05/2012 OF CONTRA COSTA REAL ESTATE LLC AS TO DEF ENDANT REINA LANNING WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/05/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2012
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2012
  • SET FOR TRACKING UD CASE ON 7/20/12 AT 7:00 IN DEPT 1CLK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2012
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 06/05/2012 OF CONTRA COSTA REAL ESTATE LLC FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS YELLOW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2012
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED (UP TO $10,000). SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rothbard, Todd B.