This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/17/2017 at 19:34:15 (UTC).

CONTINUUM V TRANSCEPT

Case Summary

On 10/02/2014 CONTINUUM filed a Contract - Security lawsuit against TRANSCEPT. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1841

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Security

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CONTINUUM CAPITAL

Defendants

TRANSCEPT PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

GLENN A. OCLASSEN

THOMAS D. KILEY

G. KIRK RAAB

THOMAS J. DIETZ

FREDERICK J. RUEGSEGGER

MATTHEW M. LOAR

JAKE R. NUNN

PARATEK PHARMACEUTICALS,INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

HARPER, BLAKE MUIR

225 Broadway, Ste. 1350

San Diego, CA 92101

BRUALDI, RICHARD B.

29 Broadway, Ste.2400

New York, NY 10006

GIBBS, PATRICK E

140 Scott Drive

Menlo Park, CA 94025

PALMER, PAMELA S

350 South Grand Ave 2 Calif Plaza Suite 3400

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2016
  • COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2015
  • STIPULATION & ORDER FOR EXTENTION OF PAGE LIMIT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2015
  • ELECTRONIC FILING TRANSACTION FEE COLLECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2015
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON/FOR COMPLAINT FILED WITH PROOF OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2015
  • ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • HEARING ON MOTION TO/FOR ENTRY OF ORDER FOR NTC & SCHEDULING OF HRG OF SETT FILED BY CONTINUUM CAPITAL, TRANSCEPT PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., GLENN A. OCLASSEN, THOMAS D. KILEY, G. KIRK RAAB, THOMAS J. DIETZ, FREDERICK J. RUEGSEGGER, MATTHEW M. LOAR; Disposition: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • HEARING ON MOTION TO/FOR ENTRY OF ORDER FOR NTC & SCHEDULING OF HRG OF SETT FILED BY CONTINUUM CAPITAL, TRANSCEPT PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., GLENN A. OCLASSEN, THOMAS D. KILEY, G. KIRK RAAB, THOMAS J. DIETZ, FREDERICK J. RUEGSEGGER, MATTHEW M. LOAR; Disposition: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • HEARING ON MOTION TO/FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF ALL PARTIES SETTLEMENT FILED BY CONTINUUM CAPITAL; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • ELECTRONIC FILING TRANSACTION FEE COLLECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • PROPOSED ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
91 More Docket Entries
  • 10/15/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL W/NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF COMPLAINT FILED 10/02/2014 OF CONTINUUM CAPITAL AS TO DEFT(S) G. KIRK RAAB, SIGNED ON 10/09/14 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL W/NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF COMPLAINT FILED 10/02/2014 OF CONTINUUM CAPITAL AS TO DEFT(S) THOMAS J. DIETZ, SIGNED ON 10/09/14 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2014
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 12/11/14 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2014
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 11/17/14 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2014
  • COMPLEX LITIGATION DESIGNATION FEE ON COMPLAINT FILED 10/02/2014 OF CONTINUUM CAPITAL PAID BY ONE LEGAL OBHO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2014
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2014
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 10/02/2014 OF CONTINUUM CAPITAL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2014
  • COLOR OF FILE IS BLUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2014
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2014
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.