This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 07/12/2017 at 03:32:23 (UTC).

CONS. OF SHIRLEY ANN CROWE

Case Summary

On 06/27/2017 CONS OF SHIRLEY ANN CROWE was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0027

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Conservators

DAVID HANKS

CCC HEALTH SERVICES DEPT

Decedent and Conservatee

SHIRLEY ANN CROWE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Conservator Attorneys

POLING, SCOTT E

1330 Arnold Drive Ste 252

Martinez, CA 94553

LAPLANTE, KATHLEEN

Contra Costa County Counsel Of Po Box 69

Martinez, CA 94553

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2017
  • HEARING RE: FIRST ACCT & RPT, PTN FOR FEES, COMPENSATION FILED ON 06/27/17 BY DAVID HANKS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • REPORT OF CAROLYN D CAIN AS COUNSEL FOR THE CONSERVATEE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON 1ST ACCOUNT AND REPT FILED (08/16/17, 9AM, 14) W/POS OF MAIL 06/29/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • DECLARATION OF CAROLYN D CAIN FILED RE: AS COURT APPOINTED COUNSEL FOR THE CONSERVATEE IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ATTORNEYS F

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • HEARING SET FOR 8/16/17 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • DEFAULT DEPARTMENT CHANGED TO 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • FEE RECEIVED FOR FIRST ACCT & RPT BY POLING AND POLING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • SUBSEQUENT PETITION FIRST ACCT & RPT, PTN FOR FEES, COMPENSATION FILED BY DAVID HANKS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • CLERKS TICKLER CALENDAR - INTERNAL CHECK FOR 12 MONTH INVESTIGATION REVIEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • CLERKS TICKLER CALENDAR - INTERNAL CHECK FOR TWELVE MONTH ACCOUNTING REVIEW

    Read MoreRead Less
90 More Docket Entries
  • 01/05/2016
  • (PROBATE) CONFIDENTIAL SUPPL INFORMATION BY SHIRLEY ANN CROWE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • CITATION ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • DEFAULT DEPARTMENT CHANGED TO 39T

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • TEMPORARY CONSERVATORSHIP PETITION FOR APPT OF TEMP CTR OF PERS/ESTATE FILED BY CCC HEALTH SERVICESDEPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • HEARING SET FOR 2/23/16 AT 13:30 IN DEPT. 39T

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • COLOR OF FILE IS GRAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • PETITION FOR CONSERVATORSHIP OF THE PERSON AND THEESTATE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • REFEREE TDT IS ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • UPDATED CASE TO CHANGE SPELLING OF PARTY CCC HEALTH SERVICESDEPT

    Read MoreRead Less