This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 07/10/2017 at 04:09:32 (UTC).

CONS. OF MARSHA ROBINSON

Case Summary

On 06/14/2017 CONS OF MARSHA ROBINSON was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0011

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Conservator

CCC HEALTH SERVICES DEPT

Conservatee

MARSHA ROBINSON

Concord, CA 94518

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Conservator Attorney

COUNTY COUNSEL

651 Pine Street 9Th Floor

Martinez, CA 94553

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2017
  • PUBLIC GUARDIAN HEARING RE: PTN FOR COMPENSATION FOR PERSON AND SMALL ESTATEE FILED ON 06/14/17 BY CCC HEALTH SERVICESDEPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • HEARING SET FOR 8/01/17 AT 13:30 IN DEPT. 39

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION FOR COMPENSATION FOR PERSON AND SMALL EST FILED (D39 08-01-17 1:30PM) WITH PROOF OF MAILING ON 06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • SUBSEQUENT PETITION FOR COMPENSATION FOR PERSON AND SMALL ESTATE FILED BY CCC HEALTH SERVICESDEPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • DECLARATION OF CONSERVATOR OF THE ESTATE, RITA MATLI FILED RE: PROBATE CODE SECTION 2628

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • DECL OF NINA DONG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • LETTERS OF CONSERVATORSHIP OF PERSON & ESTATE ISSUED/FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • DETERMINATION OF CONSERVATEES APPROPRIATE LEVEL OF CARE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED RE: ORDER RE COURT INVESTIGATION FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED RE: ORDER SETTLING FIRST ACCOUNT AND REPORT, MAILED ON 03-11-16 TO -SEE LIST-

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 01/17/2014
  • ORIGINAL CITATION WITH RETURN OF SERVICE BY PERSONAL DELIVERY TO MARSHA ROBINSON ON 01/16/14 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2014
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION FOR PROBATE CONSERVATOR FILED (D15 02-11-14 1:30PM) WITH PROOF OF MAILING ON 12-24-13 TO -SEE LIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2014
  • COLOR OF FILE IS RED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2014
  • HEARING SET FOR 2/11/14 AT 13:40 IN DEPT. 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2014
  • (PROBATE) CONFIDENTIAL SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2014
  • CITATION ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2014
  • DECLARATION OF VERONIQUE PETERSON FILED RE: PERSONS ENTITLED TO NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2014
  • PETITION FOR CONSERVATORSHIP OF THE PERSON AND THEESTATE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2014
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2014
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.