This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 07/31/2020 at 18:20:49 (UTC).

CONS OF JANICE ANN SMITH

Case Summary

On 03/03/2020 CONS OF JANICE ANN SMITH was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1511

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Conservatees

JILL AYLISH CHATTERLEY

LINDA ATKINSON

BRIAN D WIRSCHING

KEVIN G LYNCH

Conservator

CCC HEALTH SERVICES DEPT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Conservatee Attorneys

SNOW, STEPHEN L

COHEN, JEFFREY S

LYNCH, KEVIN G

Conservator Attorney

COUNTY COUNSEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketCLERKS TICKLER CALENDAR - INTERNAL CHECK FOR 12 MONTH INVESTIGATION REVIEW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketCLERKS TICKLER CALENDAR - INTERNAL CHECK FOR TWELVE MONTH ACCOUNTING REVIEW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketLETTERS OF CONSERVATORSHIP ISSUED/FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketCCC HEALTH SERVICESDEPT ADDED AS A PARTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING CONSERVATOR OF PERSON AND ESTATE FILED, NO BOND REQUIRED, ORDER EXPIRES: UPON FURTHER COURT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketHEARING RE: PTN FOR APPTMNT OF CONS OF PERSON & ESTATE FILED ON 03/03/20 BY JILL AYLISH CHATTERLEY; Disposition: GRANTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketHEARING RE: PTN FOR APPTMNT OF CONS OF PERSON & ESTATE FILED ON 03/03/20 BY JILL AYLISH CHATTERLEY; Disposition: NOT HEARD/CONT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketFIRST SUPPLEMENT TO PTN FOR APPT OF SUCC CTOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ON PTN FOR APPT OF CTOR OF PERS/ESTATE FILED (W/POS 4-6-20; SEE SERV LIST) HRG 5-6-20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketPOST-MOVE NOTICE OF CHANGE OF RESIDENCE OF CONSERVATEE FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
90 More Docket Entries
  • 10/17/2017
  • DocketINVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT - FINAL FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DocketPROPERTY TAX CERTIFICATION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COURT INVESTIGATOR FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING CONSERVATOR OF ESTATE BRIAN D. WIRCHING APPOINTED CONS OF ESTATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DocketCHANGE CASE CATEGORY FROM CTRPM TO CTREM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DocketREFEREE MGH IS ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DocketTHE MAIN DOCUMENTS PREVIOUSLY FILED IN THE TRANSFERRED RECORD ARE:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DocketTRANSFERRED-IN COMPLAINT/PETITION TO/FOR CONSERVATORSHIP FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DocketCASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DocketPROBATE RECORD ON TRANSFER FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY FILED (PRIOR CASE NO. PP003406); TRANSFER FEE RECEIVED FROM JILL A CHATTERLEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less