This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 05/11/2023 at 07:03:55 (UTC).

CONS. OF FRANK SCOTT

Case Summary

On 04/08/2021 CONS OF FRANK SCOTT was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0480

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CCC HEALTH SERVICES DEPT

Conservatee

SCOTT, FRANK

Not Classified By Court

SCOTT, FELICIA

Not Yet Classified

CSHIP, OF FRANK SCOTT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

COUNTY COUNSEL

Not Classified By Court Attorney

SANTAELLA, IVETTE M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketHearing in Re:; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar; Comment: 000100+PETITION FOR APPT OF PROBATE CONSERVATOR+04/08/21+0001+

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of/to:; Comment: NOTICE OF/TO CONSERVATEE'S DEATH FILED BY CCC HEALTH SERVICES, DEPT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED RE:%%X%% %%X%% %%X%% FFT: RE: ORDER THAT CONSERVATEE'S ESTATE BE ASSESSED FOR CI SERVICES (PRO-RATA). SRV'D ON PARTIES FFT: LISTED ON THE ORDER. COPY OF ORDER TO CCU FOR COLLECTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • Docket*; Comment: REPORT OF COUNSEL RE CASE STATUS FILED %%X%%

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketOrder Filed Re:; Comment: ORDER RE EX PARTE PETITION FOR AUTHORITY TO CONSENT TO N O INTERVENTION TREATMENT PLAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Re:; Comment: DECLARATION OF STEVEN RETTIG FILED RE: ISO EX PARTE PTN FOR AUTHORITY TO CONSENT TO NO IN TERVENTION TREATMENT %%X%%

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketEx Parte Application; Comment: EX-PARTE APPLICATION FOR PTN FOR AUTHORITY TO CONSENT TO NO INTERVENTION TR FILED BY CCC HEALTH SERVICES, DEPT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketHearing in Re:; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 000100+PETITION FOR APPT OF PROBATE CONSERVATOR+04/08/21+0001+

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • Docket*; Comment: REPORT OF COUNSEL RE CASE STATUS FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketOrder Filed Re:; Comment: ORDER THAT THE CONSERVATEE'S ESTATE BE ASSESSED $800.00 FOR THE COURT INVESTIGATOR'S SERVICE CM: (REVIEW REPORT DATED 8/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 04/08/2021
  • Docket*; Comment: CCC/SPR CHANGES ATTORNEY FOR CCC HEALTH SERVICES, DEPT AND IS REPLACED BY CCC/

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • Docket*; Comment: DECLARATION REGARDING AMERICAN INDIAN TRIBES AFFILIATION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued; Comment: CITATION ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • Docket*; Comment: DECLARATION REGARDING PERSONS ENTITLED TO NOTICE FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • Docket*; Comment: CAPACITY DECLARATION - CONSERVATORSHIP FILED %%X%%

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Probate; Comment: NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION FOR APPT OF TEMPORARY CONSERVATOR FILED (HEARING DATE 04/19/21 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPT. 30/15) WITH P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Probate; Comment: NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION FOR APPT OF CONSERVATOR OF PERSON FILED (HEARING DATE 06/28/21 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPT. 30/15) WITH P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketHearing set for:; Comment: Hearing set for 6/28/21 at 9:00 in Dept. 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketSubsequent Petition Filed; Comment: re: __________ SUBSEQUENT PETITION FILED BY SCOTT, FRANK 10001+

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Conservator - Person; Comment: PETITION FOR CONSERVATORSHIP OF PERSON ONLY FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less