This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 08/23/2023 at 00:01:00 (UTC).

CONS. OF EVA BROWN

Case Summary

On 02/22/2021 CONS OF EVA BROWN was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The Judges overseeing this case are George, Virginia M and Schmuck, Mark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0123

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

Judge Details

Judges

George, Virginia M

Schmuck, Mark

 

Party Details

Conservator

CCC HEALTH SERVICES DEPT PUBLIC GUARDIAN

Conservatee

BROWN, EVA

Not Yet Classified

CSHIP, OF EVA BROWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Conservator Attorney

COUNTY COUNSEL

Conservatee Attorney

LAMAY, MICHAEL I

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Mail RE: ORDER THAT CONSERVATEE'S ESTATE BE ASSESSED FOR CI SERVICES (PRO-RATA).

10/12/2022: Proof of Service by Mail RE: ORDER THAT CONSERVATEE'S ESTATE BE ASSESSED FOR CI SERVICES (PRO-RATA).

Order Filed Re: That the conservatee's estate be assessed for the court investigator's services

10/07/2022: Order Filed Re: That the conservatee's estate be assessed for the court investigator's services

Subsequent Petition Filed

07/26/2022: Subsequent Petition Filed

Proof of Service by Mail

10/05/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

06/16/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Order Filed Re:

06/02/2021: Order Filed Re:

Order Appointing

06/02/2021: Order Appointing

Dismissal Filed

03/08/2021: Dismissal Filed

Order Filed Re:

03/04/2021: Order Filed Re:

Miscellaneous Filing Re:

10/07/2022: Miscellaneous Filing Re:

Notice Filed Re:

10/04/2022: Notice Filed Re:

Minutes

10/03/2022: Minutes

Notice of Hearing Re:

07/27/2022: Notice of Hearing Re:

Inventory and Appraisal Filed

02/09/2022: Inventory and Appraisal Filed

Notice of/to:

02/09/2022: Notice of/to:

Notice of/to:

06/16/2021: Notice of/to:

Letters Issued

06/02/2021: Letters Issued

Hearing in Re:

05/24/2021: Hearing in Re:

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Comment: ORDER SETTLING 1ST ACCT & RPT OF CTR & ATTY ON 3-7-23 SEE SVC LIST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketOrder Filed Re:; Comment: Settling The First Account and Report of Conservator and Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketNotes; Comment: ORDER SETTLING FIRST ACCT SIGNED; HELD IN RM 210.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketHearing on Petition in Re:; Judicial Officer: George, Virginia M; Hearing Time: 9:01 AM; Result: Granted; Comment: FOR FIRST ACCOUNT AND REPORT FILED 07/26/22 BY CC HEALTH SERVICES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketDeclaration Re:; Comment: Matters

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketDeclaration Re:; Comment: Declaration of Conservator

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketHearing on Petition in Re:; Judicial Officer: Schmuck, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Heard in Part; Comment: FIRST ACCOUNT AND REPORT FILED 07/26/22 BY CC HEALTH SERVICES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Comment: RE: ORDER THAT CONSERVATEE'S ESTATE BE ASSESSED FOR CI SERVICES (PRO-RATA). PARTIES SERVED AS LISTED ON THE ORDER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketProbate Confidential Report of Court Investigator Filed; Comment: Medical and CLETS Addendum to the Court Investigator's Report

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketProbate Confidential Report of Court Investigator Filed; Comment: Review Report of the Court Investigator pursuant to Sections 1850 & 1851

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Probate; Comment: NOTICE OF HEARING ON FILED PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR+(D30/15 05-24-2021 9:00AM) WITH PROOF OF MAILING+ON 02-23-21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Probate; Comment: NOTICE OF HEARING ON FILED PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF TEMPORARY C'TOR+(D30/15 03-08-21 9:00AM) WITH PROOF OF MAILING+ON 02-23-

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Re:; Comment: DECLARATION OF EDWARD BACHMANN FILED RE: PERSONS ENTITLED TO NOTICE %%X%% %%X%%

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Re:; Comment: DECLARATION OF EDWARD BACHMANN FILED RE: AMERICAN INDIAN TRIBES AFFILIATION %%X%% %%X%%

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued; Comment: CITATION ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketPetition to Appoint Temporary Conservator - Person & Estate; Comment: TEMPORARY CONSERVATORSHIP PETITION PERSON AND ESTATE FILED BY CCC HEALTH SERVICES, DEPT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • Docket*; Comment: CAPACITY DECLARATION FILED %%X%%

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketHearing set for:; Comment: Hearing set for 5/24/21 at 9:00 in Dept. 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment; Comment: CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Conservator - Person & Estate; Comment: PETITION FOR CONSERVATORSHIP OF THE PERSON AND THEESTATE FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less