This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 09/05/2023 at 16:04:40 (UTC).

CONS. OF DANIEL RODRIGUEZ

Case Summary

On 12/23/2020 CONS OF DANIEL RODRIGUEZ was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The Judge overseeing this case is George, Virginia M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1520

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

Judge Details

Judge

George, Virginia M

 

Party Details

Conservator

CCC HEALTH SERVICES DEPT PUBLIC GUARDIAN

Conservatee

RODRIGUEZ, DANIEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Comment: RE: ORDER THAT CONSERVATEE'S ESTATE BE ASSESSED FOR CI SERVICES (PRO-RATA). PARTIES SERVED AS LISTED ON THE ORDER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketOrder Filed Re:; Comment: That the Conservatee's Estate be Assessed for the Court Investigator's Services

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketProbate Confidential Report of Court Investigator Filed; Comment: Medical Information Addendum

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketProbate Confidential Report of Court Investigator Filed; Comment: Review Report

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Comment: served by mail, order settling the first account and report of conservator

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • DocketOrder Filed Re:; Comment: Settling the first account & report of conservator

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • DocketNotes; Comment: ORDER SETTLING ACCT SIGNED; HELD IN RM 210

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • DocketHearing on Petition in Re:; Judicial Officer: George, Virginia M; Hearing Time: 9:01 AM; Result: Held; Comment: FIRST ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF CONSERVATOR AND PETITION FOR COMPENSATION FILED BY CCC HEALTH SERVICES DEPT. ON 12/08/22; Conservator; Parties Present; Conservator; Private Attorney: COUNTY COUNSEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketOrder Appointing Counsel; Comment: WITH PROOF OF SERVICE FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketHearing on Petition in Re:; Judicial Officer: George, Virginia M; Hearing Time: 9:01 AM; Result: Heard in Part; Comment: First acct and report of conservator and petition for compensation filed by CCC Health Services Dept. on 12/08/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Probate; Comment: NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF TEMPORARY CONSERVATOR FILED (D15/30 01-11-2021 9:00AM) WITH PROOF OF MAILING %%X%%

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketPetition to Appoint Temporary Conservator - Person & Estate; Comment: TEMPORARY CONSERVATORSHIP PETITION PERSON AND ESTATE FILED BY CCC HEALTH SERVICES, DEPT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Probate; Comment: NOTICE OF HEARING ON FILED PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR+(D15/30 03-08-2021 9:00AM) WITH PROOF OF MAILING+ON 12-23-20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketDeclaration Re:; Comment: DECLARATION OF JONEL MIZERAK FILED RE: AMERICAN INDIAN TRIBES AFFILIATION %%X%% %%X%%

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketDeclaration Re:; Comment: DECLARATION OF JONEL MIZERAK FILED RE: PERSONS ENTITLED TO NOTICE %%X%% %%X%%

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • Docket*; Comment: CAPACITY DECLARATION FILED %%X%%

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketCitation Issued; Comment: CITATION ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketHearing set for:; Comment: Hearing set for 3/08/21 at 9:00 in Dept. 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment; Comment: CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Conservator - Person & Estate; Comment: PETITION FOR CONSERVATORSHIP OF THE PERSON AND THEESTATE FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less