This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 04/25/2019 at 15:01:51 (UTC).

CONCORD LODGING VS COOPER

Case Summary

On 05/27/2009 CONCORD LODGING filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against COOPER. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Concord Superior Court located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0485

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CONCORD LODGNG LTD

Defendant

STACEY B COOPER

Concord, CA 94518

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SINGH, PUNEET K

7676 Hazard Center Drive Suite 900-C

San Diego, CA 92108

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2009
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA RETURNED FULLY-SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2009
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL: 2ND ATTEMPT TO SEND TRIAL DATE TO STACEY COOPER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2009
  • DocketCLERK`S CALENDAR - FAILURE TO DISPOSITION UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2009
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2009
  • DocketCOPY OF JUDGMENT MAILED IN ENVELOPE PROVIDED BY PLTS ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2009
  • DocketJUDGMENT ENTERED - UNCONTESTED COURT TRIAL ON 07/07/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2009
  • DocketFEE RECEIVED FOR COPY OF JUDGMENT FROM CONCORD LODGNG LTD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2009
  • DocketCOURT TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2009
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL: NOTICE OF TRIAL DATE FOR DEFT STACEY B COOPER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2009
  • DocketCLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF 2ND ATTEMPT TO SEND TRIAL DATE TO DEFT SENT TO ALL PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 06/02/2009
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED RE: ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2009
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE MEMO ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2009
  • DocketANSWER TO UD COMPLAINT FILED 05/27/2009 OF CONCORD LODGNG LTD FILED BY STACEY B COOPER. ATTORNEY PRO/PER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2009
  • DocketRECD STATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FROM PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2009
  • DocketUD COMPLAINT FILED 05/27/2009 OF CONCORD LODGNG LTD AS TO DEFENDANT STACEY B COOPER, STACY COOPER ADDED AS AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2009
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2009
  • DocketHEARING ON FAILURE TO DISPOSITION UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT WAS SET FOR 7/15/09 AT 17:00 IN DEPT. 3CLK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2009
  • DocketORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 05/27/2009 OF CONCORD LODGNG LTD FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2009
  • DocketCOLOR OF FILE IS BLUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2009
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED (UNDER $10,000). SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SINGH, PUNJEET K.