This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 12/17/2021 at 21:12:17 (UTC).

COLLECTO, INC. VS TAYLOR

Case Summary

On 01/27/2020 COLLECTO, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TAYLOR. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0967

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketCLERK'S TICKLER ON CONSUMER CREDIT COLLECTIONS CASE - CHECK FOR FILING OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN 360 DAYS OF FILING COMPLAINT; Disposition: VACATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketCLERK'S TICKLER ON CONSUMER CREDIT COLLECTIONS CASE - CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE FILED WITHIN 180 DAYS OF FILING COMPLAINT; Disposition: VACATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITH PREJUDICEAS TO ENTIRE ACTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketCONSUMER CREDIT COLLECTIONS CMPL (CRC 3.740) FILED 01/27/2020 OF COLLECTO, INC. AS TO PLAINTIFF COLLECTO, INC., EOS-CCA ADDED AS AN INDIVIDUAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketDECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF FILED RE: VENUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketDECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF FILED RE: REDUCTION OF FILING FEES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketCOLOR OF FILE: YELLOW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketCASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL SUMMONS ON CONSUMER CREDIT COLLECTIONS CMPL (CRC 3.740) FILED 01/27/2020 OF COLLECTO, INC. FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketPLACED ON CLERK'S TICKLER CALENDAR FOR 7/27/20, AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketPLACED ON CLERK'S TICKLER CALENDAR FOR 1/22/21, AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketCASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED; SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less