Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/14/2017 at 22:06:39 (UTC).

COLIN POND VS. INTEGRATED COMMUNICATIONS

Case Summary

On 02/18/2014 COLIN POND filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against INTEGRATED COMMUNICATIONS. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1041

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

COLIN POND

JENNY THORNBURG

MARK SALDIVAR

Defendants

INTEGRATED COMMUNICATIONS TECHNOLOGIES

INTEGRATED COMMUNICATIONS TECHNOLOGIES LLC

MARIO TANGLAO

JARRYD TANGLAO

Not Classified By Court

CASE MEDIATOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ZURADA, MARTIN

700 Ygnacio Valley Road Suite 300

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

VENARDI, MARK L

700 Ygnacio Valley Road Suite 300

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Defendant Attorneys

ARCELLANA, JAMES A

1985 Bonifacio St Suite 102

Concord, CA 94520

WEBSTER, JON

1985 Bonifacio Street Suite 102

Concord, CA 94520

Not Classified By Court Attorney

CARR, FREDERICK J

46 Ryan Avenue

Mill Valley, CA 94941

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2017
  • DEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM 34 TO 12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • JURY TRIAL - LONG CAUSE/ 7 DAY(S); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • ISSUE CONFERENCE; Disposition: CONTINUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • ISSUE CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2015
  • REQUEST FILED & DISMISSAL ENTERED 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF COLIN POND AS TO DEFENDANT INTEGRATED COMMUNICATIONS TECHNOLOGIES, INTEGRATED COMMUNICATIONS TECHNOLOGIES LLC, MARIO TANGLAO, JARRYD TANGLAO WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2015
  • JURY TRIAL - LONG CAUSE/ 7 DAY(S); Disposition: DROPPED BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2015
  • ISSUE CONFERENCE; Disposition: DROPPED BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2015
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2015
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY COLIN POND, JENNY THORNBURG, MARK SALDIVAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL/EMAIL OF CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT ON MARTIN ZURADA FILED; SERVED ON 01/22/15

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 06/12/2013
  • PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/15/2013 OF COLIN POND AS TO JARRYD TANGLAO WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/04/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2013
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT WAS SET FOR 7/19/13 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2013
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 10/21/13 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2013
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 7/19/13 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2013
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2013
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/15/2013 OF COLIN POND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2013
  • COLOR OF FILE IS RED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2013
  • *DELETED*,CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 10/21/13 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2013
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2013
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INTEGRATED COMMUNICATIONS TECHNOLOGIES is a litigant