Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/01/2017 at 11:55:24 (UTC).

COLEMAN VS. KB HOME SOUTH BAY INC.

Case Summary

On 09/18/2012 COLEMAN filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against KB HOME SOUTH BAY INC. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2199

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HANA OSHIO

WAI C LAM

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

KB HOMES SOUTH BAY INC.

Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

LI METAL SYSTEMS, INC.

KB HOMES SOUTH BAY INC.

STAIRBUILDERS, INC.

ALL STATE CONTRACT FLOORS, INC.

W.T. COOK CONSTRUCTION, INC

RESCOM OVERHEAD DOORS, INC.

AMERICAN BUSINESS MANAGEMENT

WESTERN SHOWER DOOR, INC.

PEGGY S. LANE, INC.

ROCKHURST PAINTING

CANTRELL CONSTRUCTION, INC.

PETERSEN-DEAN, INC.

CURT HALL

NORCRAFT COMPANIES

RCR PLUMBING & MECHANICAL, INC.

CBC FRAMING, INC.

BRADY'S STONE & GROUT SEALING

AM DYWALL, INC.

13 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BUQUID, MARGARET A

1810 State Street

San Diego, CA 92101

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorney

GLASPY, MARY KAY

100 Pringle Ave Ste 750

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

SEROT, DANIEL A

1600 South Main Plaza Suite 325

Walnut Creek, CA 94598

LEVY, DAVID M.

1600 South Main Plaza, Suite 325

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

GLASPY, MARY KAY

100 Pringle Ave Ste 750

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

MENEKSHE, ESQ, AYHAN M.

1210 S. Bascom Ave. Suite 226

San Jose, CA 95128

WATERMAN, ARIEL C

215 Lennon Lane, Suite 200

Walnut Creek, CA 94598

Other Attorneys

BYBEE, ROBERT BRUCE

2010 Crow Canyon Place Suite 330

San Ramon, CA 94583

MARTHA, RICHARD H.

980 Ninth Street 16Th Floor

Sacramento, CA 95814

SCHAFFERR, TODD A

P. O. Box 277010

Sacramento, CA 95827-7010

MACKEY, SCOTT M

333 Bush Street Ste.1100

San Francisco, CA 94104

WELCH, STEPHEN B

P.O. Box 8035 2033 N. Main Street #800

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

BUREK, LAWRENCE M

550 North Parkcenter Drive, Ste 204

Santa Ana, CA 92705

STARSKY, JEFFREY M

4700 Lang Ave

Mcclellan, CA 95652

HERP, PAUL A

525 Mark Street Suite 2850

San Francisco, CA 94105

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2015
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • ELECTRONIC FILING TRANSACTION FEE COLLECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • ELECTRONIC FILING TRANSACTION FEE COLLECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • ORDER RE STLMNT. AGREEMENT DEEMED SIGNED BY CROSS DEFS COUNSEL PURS TO CCP664.7 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • DISMISSAL FILED/ENTERED ON THE CROSS-COMPLAINT OF LI METAL SYSTEMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • ELECTRONIC FILING TRANSACTION FEE COLLECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • ELECTRONIC FILING TRANSACTION FEE COLLECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • DISMISSAL FILED/ENTERED ON THE CROSS-COMPLAINT OF STAIRBUILDERS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • DISMISSAL FILED/ENTERED ON THE COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFFS

    Read MoreRead Less
230 More Docket Entries
  • 11/08/2012
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT WAS SET FOR 12/27/12 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL W/NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF COMPLAINT FILED 09/18/2012 OF REBECCA COLEMAN AS TO DEFT(S) KB HOMES SOUTH BAYINC., SIGNED ON 11/02/12 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2012
  • CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2012
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 11/02/12 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2012
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2012
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 09/18/2012 OF REBECCA COLEMAN FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS GOLDENROD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2012
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 11/27/12 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2012
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2012
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STAIRBUILDERS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where W.T. COOK CONSTRUCTION, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Peggy S Lane Inc, A California Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where NORCRAFT COMPANIES INC. is a litigant