Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/01/2017 at 00:49:02 (UTC).

COBB VS SIERRA EQUIPMENT RENTAL INC.

Case Summary

On 08/23/2012 COBB filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against SIERRA EQUIPMENT RENTAL INC. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2053

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KAREN COBB

STEPHANIE SMITH

Defendants

SIERRA EQUIPMENT RENTAL INC.

TIM WIGGINS

KARRI KINDELL

MEL WEIR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KEENAN, JR, JAMES J

535 Main St, 3Rd Floor

Martinez, CA 94553

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2013
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: FAILURE TO APPEAR AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2013
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2013
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Complete

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2013
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2013
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY KAREN COBB, STEPHANIE SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2012
  • DEFAULT DEPARTMENT CHANGED TO 31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2012
  • CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 10/29/12 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 1/10/13 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 08/23/2012 OF KAREN COBB FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS RED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less