Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/01/2017 at 23:04:30 (UTC).

CLARKE VS. PATTERSON DENTAL SUPPLY

Case Summary

On 12/06/2012 CLARKE filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against PATTERSON DENTAL SUPPLY. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2865

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2012

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOANNA CLARKE

Defendants

PATTERSON DENTAL SUPPLY,INC.

PATTERSON DENTAL COMPANY, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEECHAN, RICHARD J

P.O. Box 369

Santa Rosa, CA 95402

Defendant Attorney

WILBUR, MICHAEL E

3000 Lakeshore Ave

Oakland, CA 94610

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2015
  • DEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM 33 TO 09.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2013
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2013
  • CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2013
  • NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF CASE TO FEDERAL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2013
  • CASE REMOVED FROM COURT`S CONTROL DUE TO NOTICE HAVING BEEN FILED/ENTERED INTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2013
  • (U.J.) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 12/06/2012 OF JOANNA CLARKE FILED BY PATTERSON DENTAL SUPPLY,INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2012
  • PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/06/2012 OF JOANNA CLARKE AS TO PATTERSON DENTAL SUPPLY,INC. WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/14/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2012
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2012
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/06/2012 OF JOANNA CLARKE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS RED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2012
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2012
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2012
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 4/25/13 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2012
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 2/11/13 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Patterson Dental Supply Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILBUR, MICHAEL E.