This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/22/2017 at 13:35:45 (UTC).

CLANCY VS. DAVIS

Case Summary

On 01/06/2017 CLANCY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DAVIS. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2024

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SUSAN CLANCY

TIMOTHY CLANCY

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

DONALD L. DAVIS BUILDERS, INC.

JONATHAN SLAYER

JONATHAN SALYER

Cross Defendant

ZOES 1-20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BULLER, TERRY D

1418 Lakeside Dr

Oakland, CA 94612

VENARDI, MARK

1418 Lakeside Drive

Oakland, CA 94612

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

CROWLEY, DANIEL F

3558 Round Barn Blvd Suite 201

Santa Rosa, CA 95403

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2017
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEYS FILED ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 10/20/2016 OF TIMOTHY CLANCY ON BEHALF OF TIMOTHY CLANCY, SUSAN CLANCY NAMING MARK VENARDI AS CO-COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: CONTINUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED. ZACHARY SMITH SUBSTITUTES OUT AS ATTORNEY FOR JONATHAN SALYER AND IS REPLACED BY DANIEL F CROWLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: NOT HEARD/CONT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY TIMOTHY CLANCY, SUSAN CLANCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY DONALD L. DAVIS BUILDERS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • CHECK FOR REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • ADVANCED NON-REFUNDABLE JURY FEE PAID BY: ONE LEGAL, LLC, ON BEHALF OF PARTY: DONALD L. DAVIS BUILDERS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • (U.J.) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 10/20/2016 OF TIMOTHY CLANCY FILED BY DONALD L. DAVIS BUILDERS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 12/21/2016
  • PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON COMPLAINT FILED 10/20/2016 OF TIMOTHY CLANCY AS TO DONALD L. DAVIS BUILDERS, INC. WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/06/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • DEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM 21 TO 33.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • 5CMC4 CALENDARED ON 03/08/17 IN DEPT. 21. HAS BEEN UPDATED TO 03/08/17 IN DEPT. 33.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 10/20/2016 OF TIMOTHY CLANCY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • COLOR OF FILE IS YELLOW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 3/08/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 12/27/16 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 21

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.