This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 03/08/2022 at 11:26:16 (UTC).

CITY OF ELK GROVE VS ARNTZ BUILDERS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/20/2021 CITY OF ELK GROVE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ARNTZ BUILDERS. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0512

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

CITY OF ELK GROVE

Sacramento, CA 95833

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

BIG B CONSTRUCTION, INC.

WILLDAN ENGINEERING

3345 Newport Blvd. Suite 201

Newport Beach, CA 92663

SWA GROUP

3345 Newport Blvd. Ste. 201

Newport Beach, CA 92663

ARNTZ BUILDERS, INC.

777 Cuesta Drive Suite 200

Mountain View, CA 94040

SWA SAUSALITO

CITY OF ELK GROVE

Sacramento, CA 95833

BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE DEVELOPMENT, INC.

350 South Grand Ave Ste.3400

Los Angeles, CA 90071

ANCHOR SINGH PAINTING INC.

2401 American River Dr Suite 100

Sacramento, CA 95825

MARTIN BROTHERS CONSTRUCTION

3880 Atherton Road

Rocklin, CA 95765

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

WILLDAN ENGINEERING

3345 Newport Blvd. Suite 201

Newport Beach, CA 92663

ROEBBELEN COSTRUCTION, INC.

ARNTZ BUILDERS, INC.

777 Cuesta Drive Suite 200

Mountain View, CA 94040

SWA SAUSALITO

CITY OF ELK GROVE

Sacramento, CA 95833

ROEBBELEN CONSTRUCTION MANAGEMENT

1478 Stone Point Dr. Ste. 100

Roseville, CA 95661

BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE DEVELOPMENT, INC.

350 South Grand Ave Ste.3400

Los Angeles, CA 90071

PAVEMENT RECYCLINGSYSTEMS, INC.

11341 Gold Express Drive Suite 160

Gold River, CA 95670

GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

777 Cuesta Drive Suite 200

Mountain View, CA 94040

ANCHOR SINGH PAINTING INC.

2401 American River Dr Suite 100

Sacramento, CA 95825

ELS ARCHITECTURE AND URBAN DESIGN

1534 Plaza Lane, Ste. 324

Burlingame, CA 94010

MARTIN BROTHERS CONSTRUCTION

3880 Atherton Road

Rocklin, CA 95765

ROEBBELEN CONTRACTING, INC.

1478 Stone Point Dr. Ste. 100

Roseville, CA 95661

10 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorney

TYRA, DAVID W.

1331 Garden Highway Second Flr

Sacramento, CA 95833

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

SIMS, JR, BOBBY DALE

2261 Lava Ridge Court

Roseville, CA 95661

RHOADS, KATHLEEN M

3 Parkcenter Drive Ste 200

Sacramento, CA 95825

LITCHFIELD, STEPHEN B.

3345 Newport Blvd. Suite 201

Newport Beach, CA 92663

MUIR, SAMUEL J.

222 Broadway Suite 1503

Oakland, CA 94607

LITCHFIELD, STEPHEN

3345 Newport Blvd. Ste. 201

Newport Beach, CA 92663

CONSTANTINO, MATTHEW S

5860 Owens Dirve Ste 410

Pleasanton, CA 94588

POULOS, JOHN S.

2020 West El Camino Ave. Ste. 700

Sacramento, CA 95833

ROSIN, A. ROBERT

777 Cuesta Drive Suite 200

Mountain View, CA 94040

TYRA, DAVID W.

1331 Garden Highway Second Flr

Sacramento, CA 95833

CONRAD, JOHN H.

350 South Grand Ave Ste.3400

Los Angeles, CA 90071

MCELROY, JULIE D

2401 American River Dr Suite 100

Sacramento, CA 95825

MCNEILL, TIMOTHY C

3880 Atherton Road

Rocklin, CA 95765

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

CONSTANTINO, MATTHEW S

5860 Owens Dirve Ste 410

Pleasanton, CA 94588

POULOS, JOHN S.

2020 West El Camino Ave. Ste. 700

Sacramento, CA 95833

ROSIN, A. ROBERT

777 Cuesta Drive Suite 200

Mountain View, CA 94040

TYRA, DAVID W.

1331 Garden Highway Second Flr

Sacramento, CA 95833

CONRAD, JOHN H.

350 South Grand Ave Ste.3400

Los Angeles, CA 90071

MCELROY, JULIE D

2401 American River Dr Suite 100

Sacramento, CA 95825

MCNEILL, TIMOTHY C

3880 Atherton Road

Rocklin, CA 95765

TURNER, MARCUS L.

1478 Stone Point Dr. Ste. 100

Roseville, CA 95661

RIVERA, JESSE M

11341 Gold Express Drive Suite 160

Gold River, CA 95670

WALSH, PATRICIA

777 Cuesta Drive Suite 200

Mountain View, CA 94040

BUCCIERI, ROBERT J

1534 Plaza Lane, Ste. 324

Burlingame, CA 94010

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketCHECK FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketFURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketFILE RETURNED TO COURT RECORDS, MARTINEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF/TO INTENT TO APPEAR VIA COURTCALL AT CMC ON 01/12/22 FILED BY CITY OF ELK GROVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY WILLDAN ENGINEERING, SWA GROUP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY BIG B CONSTRUCTION,INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY MARTIN BROTHERS CONSTRUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE DEVELOPMENT, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY ARNTZ BUILDERS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY CITY OF ELK GROVE

    Read MoreRead Less
194 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2020
  • Docket(U.J.) CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY ARNTZ BUILDERS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • Docket(U.J.) ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF CITY OF ELK GROVE FILED BY ARNTZ BUILDERS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • Docket(U.J.) 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF CITY OF ELK GROVE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF CITY OF ELK GROVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL SUMMONS ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF CITY OF ELK GROVE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketCASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 03/02/2020 OF CITY OF ELK GROVE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketCOLOR OF FILE IS PINK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketCASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • Docket(U.J.) RECORD ON TRANSFER FROM SACRAMENTO COUNTY/JURISDICTION FILED (PRIOR CASE NO. 34-2019-00260554); TRANSFER FEE RECEIVED FROM LITCHFIELD LAW PC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROEBBELEN CONSTRUCTION MANAGEMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where MARTIN BROTHERS CONSTRUCTION is a litigant

Latest cases where ROEBBELEN CONSTRUCTION CO., INC. is a litigant